Global Patent Index - EP 1255926 A2

EP 1255926 A2 2002-11-13 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CALIBRATING A PRESSURE SENSOR

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CALIBRATING A PRESSURE SENSOR

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM KALIBRIEREN EINES DRUCKSENSORS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR ETALONNER UN CAPTEUR DE PRESSION

Publication

EP 1255926 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 01911382 A

Priority

  • DE 0100271 W
  • DE 10003906 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0155573A2] The invention relates to a method and a device for calibrating a pressure sensor (7) of a fuel dosing system of an internal combustion engine. Said fuel dosing system comprises a high-pressure pump (2) that delivers fuel from a low-pressure zone (ND) to a high-pressure zone (HD). The injectors (5) that dose the fuel from the high-pressure zone (HD) into the combustion chambers (6) of the internal combustion engine are controlled according to working characteristics. The dosing system further comprises the pressure sensor (7) that measures the pressure in the high-pressure zone (HD). The aim of the invention is to calibrate the pressure sensor (7) in such a manner that the offset-error can be reduced to a minimum. To this end, the pressure in the high-pressure zone (HD) is used as a reference pressure, the pressure in the high-pressure zone (HD) is measured by the pressure sensor (7) as the sensor pressure and the characteristic line of the pressure sensor (7) is corrected in such a manner that the difference from reference pressure and sensor pressure is reduced to a minimum.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 41/38; F02M 65/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01L 27/00 (2006.01); F02D 41/24 (2006.01); F02D 41/32 (2006.01); F02D 41/38 (2006.01); F02D 45/00 (2006.01); F02M 65/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 65/00 (2013.01); F02D 41/2441 (2013.01); F02D 41/2474 (2013.01); F02D 41/3836 (2013.01); F02D 41/2432 (2013.01); F02D 41/3854 (2013.01); F02D 2041/223 (2013.01); F02D 2250/31 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0155573A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0155573 A2 20010802; WO 0155573 A3 20020214; DE 10003906 A1 20010809; DE 50115013 D1 20090910; EP 1255926 A2 20021113; EP 1255926 B1 20090729; ES 2328105 T3 20091110; JP 2003535313 A 20031125; JP 4791671 B2 20111012; RU 2002121651 A 20040310; RU 2260142 C2 20050910; US 2003046990 A1 20030313; US 6802209 B2 20041012

INPADOC legal status


2015-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150801

2015-08-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50115013

2014-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140325

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110125

2012-02-20 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20120220

2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110124

2011-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110131

2011-10-14 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110930

2010-07-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20100503

2010-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100209

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100123

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20100122

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-11-10 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2328105 T3

2009-09-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50115013 P 20090910

2009-07-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2002-11-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020829

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI