Global Patent Index - EP 1255946 A1

EP 1255946 A1 2002-11-13 - A GASKET FOR SECURING PIPES OR PIPE COMPONENTS

Title (en)

A GASKET FOR SECURING PIPES OR PIPE COMPONENTS

Title (de)

DICHTUNG ZUR HALTERUNG VON ROHREN ODER ROHRKOMPONENTEN

Title (fr)

JOINT POUR FIXATION DE CONDUITS OU D'ELEMENTS DE CONDUITS

Publication

EP 1255946 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00940662 A

Priority

  • GB 0002508 W
  • GB 9918806 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: GB2353076A] A gasket for securing together first and second pipe components, comprises an annular elastomeric member and one or more metal segments secured to the elastomeric member. Each metal segment comprises a plurality of teeth 12a, 12b, 12c, that extend towards the centre axis of a socket end 14 of the first pipe component, for engagement with a spigot end 16 of the second pipe component. Each metal segment is also provided with a heel 20 remote from the teeth, for engagement with a heel groove 17 provided in the socket. An engaging portion is also provided which is shaped to engage an annular bead 19 of the socket, which is located longitudinally inwardly of the socket heel groove, when the annular elastomeric member 15 supporting the segment is seated in the socket. The bead acts as a fulcrum for the metal segment to allow tilting of the metal segment around the exposed periphery of the bead when transverse relative movement occurs between the pipe components. The engaging portion of the metal segment includes a recess 11a terminating in a contact point 13, or cusp, pivotably engageable with the bead. The distance h between the contact point and the most recessed part of the adjacent recess, measured in a direction perpendicular to a tangent to the recess, is such that the heel of the metal segment engages a wall 18 of the socket heel groove for all degrees of tilt of the metal segment greater than or equal to the degree of tilt corresponding to the mean annular gap G between the spigot end and the socket end (see fig 4B).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F16L 37/084

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F16L 21/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F16L 37/0845 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0113023A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

GB 2353076 A 20010214; GB 2353076 B 20040317; GB 9918806 D0 19991013; AU 5557100 A 20010313; CO 5280160 A1 20030530; EG 22184 A 20021031; EP 1255946 A1 20021113; HK 1030977 A1 20040903; WO 0113023 A1 20010222

INPADOC legal status


2009-02-06 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1047614

2007-04-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20061104

2006-07-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060623

2006-06-28 [R17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20020307

2002-11-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020307

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI