Global Patent Index - EP 1255987 A1

EP 1255987 A1 2002-11-13 - DEVICE FOR ANALYZING SUBSTANCES BY MEANS OF THIN LAYER CHROMATOGRAPHY

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR ANALYZING SUBSTANCES BY MEANS OF THIN LAYER CHROMATOGRAPHY

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUR STOFFANALYSE MITTELS DÜNNSCHICHTCHROMATOGRAPHIE

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF D'ANALYSE DE MATIERE PAR CHROMATOGRAPHIE SUR COUCHE MINCE

Publication

EP 1255987 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01901104 A

Priority

  • CH 0100066 W
  • CH 2942000 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0159445A1] The invention relates to a device which is used to analyze substances by means of thin layer chromatography, comprising a solvent tub (1) with two channels (11, 12). Two wall plates (4, 5) are mounted in the solvent tub (1), enabling thin layer plates (2, 3) to be arranged in an upright manner inside said channels in a slanted position with respect to the horizontal level thereof. The substance which is to be analyzed can thus be dropped onto or applied to the thin layer plates (2, 3) from above and a solvent can be fed to the channels (11, 12) from above at a supply point (111, 112). Upward migration of the constituents of the substance to be analyzed can thus commence without changing the position of the thin layer plate (2, 3).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01N 30/94; G01N 30/91

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 30/91 (2006.01); G01N 30/94 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01N 30/94 (2013.01); G01N 30/91 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0159445A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0159445 A1 20010816; AU 2661301 A 20010820; EP 1255987 A1 20021113; US 2003013187 A1 20030116; US 6709584 B2 20040323

INPADOC legal status


2009-04-08 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20081016

2008-07-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080605

2005-12-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: CHEMSPEED TECHNOLOGIES AG

2002-12-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: GUELLER, ROLF

2002-12-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MUNCH, SERAPHIN

2002-12-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: JABLONSKI, PHILIPPE

2002-12-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SCHROEER, JOSEF

2002-11-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020720

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI