Global Patent Index - EP 1256040 A2

EP 1256040 A2 2002-11-13 - DEVICE FOR PROCESSING ELECTRONIC DATA IN AN ACCESS-PROTECTED MANNER

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR PROCESSING ELECTRONIC DATA IN AN ACCESS-PROTECTED MANNER

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM ZUGRIFFSGESCHÜTZTEN BEHANDELN ELEKTRONISCHER DATEN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR LE TRAITEMENT AVEC CONTROLE D'ACCES DE DONNEES ELECTRONIQUES

Publication

EP 1256040 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 01903753 A

Priority

  • DE 20002346 U
  • EP 0101538 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE10020050A1] The local system [10] has a coding unit [22] for embedding protected data in another document. This operates with a processing unit [26] to control extraction of the data. Data is stored in a main memory [16] and is transmitted via an external network [12] to a host computer [30].

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 1/00 (2006.01); G06F 21/62 (2013.01); H04L 29/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06F 21/6218 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0159548A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 20002346 U1 20010613; DE 10020050 A1 20010816; EP 1256040 A2 20021113; US 2003154386 A1 20030814; WO 0159548 A2 20010816; WO 0159548 A3 20011227

INPADOC legal status


2004-12-01 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041007

2004-05-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040416

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-01-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: DR. WITTKOETTER, ERLAND

2002-12-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020903

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR