Global Patent Index - EP 1256061 A1

EP 1256061 A1 2002-11-13 - METHODS AND CIRCUITS FOR SECURING ENCACHED INFORMATION

Title (en)

METHODS AND CIRCUITS FOR SECURING ENCACHED INFORMATION

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND SCHALTUNGEN ZUR SICHERUNG VON IM CACHE-SPEICHER GESPEICHERTEN DATEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDES ET CIRCUITS PERMETTANT DE SECURISER DES INFORMATIONS EN ANTEMEMOIRE

Publication

EP 1256061 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01906738 A

Priority

  • US 0102767 W
  • US 49581300 A
  • US 60805500 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0157677A1] A method of preventing access and observation of encached information includes the steps of generating and storing private information to be encached in memory. A translation look aside buffer is updated with descriptors to the locations in memory containing the private information. A cache miss is forced to a selected location in cache to be loaded with a selected portion of the private information. The selected portion of the private information is retrieved from memory using the corresponding descriptor from the translation look aside buffer and encached. The selected portion of the private information is locked in the selected location in cache.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 12/14; G06F 12/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 12/08 (2006.01); G06F 12/12 (2006.01); G06F 12/14 (2006.01); G06F 21/57 (2013.01); G06F 21/71 (2013.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06F 21/71 (2013.01); G06F 12/126 (2013.01); G06F 21/572 (2013.01); G06F 2211/1097 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0157677A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0157677 A1 20010809; AU 3461101 A 20010814; EP 1256061 A1 20021113; JP 2003521781 A 20030715; JP 4603753 B2 20101222

INPADOC legal status


2008-07-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080108

2007-09-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070827

2003-01-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: NORTH, GREGORY, ALLEN

2003-01-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: PERRY, MATTHEW, RICHARD

2003-01-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KIRCHER, BRIAN, CHRISTOPHER

2002-12-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CIRRUS LOGIC, INC.

2002-11-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020902

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI