Global Patent Index - EP 1256066 A2

EP 1256066 A2 2002-11-13 - MICROCONTROLLER AND METHOD FOR MANAGING INTERACTIVE APPLICATIONS

Title (en)

MICROCONTROLLER AND METHOD FOR MANAGING INTERACTIVE APPLICATIONS

Title (de)

MIKROKONTROLLER UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWALTUNG VON INTERAKTIVEN ANWENDUNGEN

Title (fr)

MICROCONTROLEUR ET PROCEDE POUR LA GESTION D'APPLICATIONS INTERACTIVES

Publication

EP 1256066 A2 (FR)

Application

EP 01907717 A

Priority

  • FR 0100351 W
  • FR 0001502 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0157699A2] The invention concerns a microcontroller designed to be incorporated in a first portable object, in particular having a card format, co-operating with a terminal. The invention is characterised in that the microcontroller comprises a device for managing interactive applications of a second portable object, said second portable object comprising at least an interactive application including interface commands and data enabling interaction with at least an interface of said terminal, said device being capable of managing data exchanges and executing said interface commands between said terminal and said second portable object. The invention is particularly applicable to the field of mobile telephone systems.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 15/78

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04W 88/02 (2009.01); G06F 9/46 (2006.01); G06F 15/78 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06Q 20/3227 (2013.01); G06F 15/7814 (2013.01); G06Q 20/3229 (2013.01); G06Q 20/3563 (2013.01); H04W 88/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0157699A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 0157699 A2 20010809; WO 0157699 A3 20011220; EP 1256066 A2 20021113; FR 2804769 A1 20010810; FR 2804769 B1 20020322

INPADOC legal status


2013-08-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20130213

2012-10-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G06F 9/46 20060101ALI20120903BHEP

2012-10-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G06F 15/78 20060101ALI20120903BHEP

2012-10-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H04W 88/02 20090101AFI20120903BHEP

2009-01-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GEMALTO SA

2008-04-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080314

2004-09-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AXALTO S.A.

2004-07-01 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): FR GB

2002-11-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020829

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR