Global Patent Index - EP 1256077 A1

EP 1256077 A1 2002-11-13 - DISSEMINATION OF DATA

Title (en)

DISSEMINATION OF DATA

Title (de)

DATENVERBREITUNG

Title (fr)

DISSEMINATION DE DONNEES

Publication

EP 1256077 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01902602 A

Priority

  • EP 01902602 A
  • EP 00650007 A
  • IE 0100017 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0157746A1] An advisor system (1) sets up a virtual server on a host system (15) via the Internet (10). The virtual server is general to the advisor's business, and it also includes secure links to a secure server of the host system (15) in which client data is stored. The virtual server and the secure data areas are set up initially. Data is processed in the advisor system (1, 41) and template rules are applied at a high level such as selection of pages to be included. If the output is ultimately for dissemination via the host system (15), further template rules are applied (45). This involves a cell-by-cell process which determines if the cell content is to be displayed and performs conversion to markup symbols according to display attributes. Subsequently, client access is according to the menus structures previously generated by the advisor.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 17/60; G06F 17/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 17/30 (2006.01); G06F 21/62 (2013.01); G06Q 10/00 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06Q 10/10 (2013.01); G06F 17/3089 (2013.01); G06F 21/6245 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0157746A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

GB IE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0157746 A1 20010809; AU 3045901 A 20010814; EP 1256077 A1 20021113; IE 20010098 A1 20010919; IE S20010099 A2 20010919

INPADOC legal status


2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): GB IE

2004-01-29 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-12-17 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030617

2003-01-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021204

2002-11-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020905

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI