Global Patent Index - EP 1256087 A1

EP 1256087 A1 2002-11-13 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR AUTOMATED IMAGE ANALYSIS OF BIOLOGICAL SPECIMENS

Title (en)

METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR AUTOMATED IMAGE ANALYSIS OF BIOLOGICAL SPECIMENS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND GERÄT ZUR AUTOMATISCHEN BILDANALYSE VON BIOLOGISCHEN PROBEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DESTINES A REALISER UNE ANALYSE D'IMAGE AUTOMATISEE SUR DES ECHANTILLONS BIOLOGIQUES

Publication

EP 1256087 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01906915 A

Priority

  • US 0103452 W
  • US 49546100 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0157785A1] A method and apparatus for automated cell analysis of biological specimens automatically scans at a low magnification to acquire images (288) which are analyzed to determine candidate cell objects of interest. The low magnification images are converted from a first color space to a second color space (290). The color space converted image is then low pass filtered (292) and compared to a threshold (294) to remove artifacts and background objects from the candidate objects of interest pixels of the color converted image. The candidate object of interest pixels are morphologically processed (296) to group candidate object of interest pixels together into groups which are compared to blob parameters (298) to identify candidate objects of interest which correspond to cells or other structures relevant to medical diagnosis of the biological specimen. The location coordinates of the objects of interest are stored and additional images of the candidate cell objects are acquired at high magnification. The high magnification images are analyzed in the same manner as the low magnification images to confirm the candidate objects of interest which are objects of interest. A high magnification image of each confirmed object of interest is stored for later review and evaluation by a pathologist.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06K 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06K 9/00 (2006.01); G06K 9/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06K 9/00134 (2013.01); G06K 9/3233 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0157785 A1 20010809; AU 3476501 A 20010814; EP 1256087 A1 20021113; EP 1256087 A4 20051221

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-26 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20090325

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ELLIS, ROBERT

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: DECKER, WILLIAM, J.

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MCLAREN, GINA

2007-05-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060621

2006-07-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060621

2005-12-21 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20051104

2003-04-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ELLIS, ROBERT

2003-04-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: DECKER, WILLIAM, J.

2003-04-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MCLAREN, GINA

2002-11-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020827

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI