Global Patent Index - EP 1256089 A2

EP 1256089 A2 2002-11-13 - TACTILE SENSOR

Title (en)

TACTILE SENSOR

Title (de)

TAKTILER SENSOR

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIFS ET PROCEDES DE DETECTION TACTILE

Publication

EP 1256089 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 01914378 A

Priority

  • US 0104837 W
  • US 50420700 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0161634A2] The tactile sensor has at least two conductive workpieces which bear on one another at a bearing area, at least one workpiece of which is produced from elastomer, with the result that it is possible to measure a contact resistance between the workpieces, which contact resistance is dependent at least on a pressure on the bearing area. At least one of the conductive workpieces comprises a conductive closed cell foam.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06K 11/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 3/045 (2006.01); G06F 3/033 (2006.01); G06F 3/041 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06F 3/045 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0161634A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 0161634 A2 20010823; WO 0161634 A3 20020328; AU 3977201 A 20010827; EP 1256089 A2 20021113; JP 2003523584 A 20030805

INPADOC legal status


2010-01-13 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090724

2009-04-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G06F 3/045 20060101AFI20090305BHEP

2007-12-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20071102

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-11-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020819

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI