Global Patent Index - EP 1256122 A1

EP 1256122 A1 2002-11-13 - INTERRUPTING SUBASSEMBLY FOR SWITCHING APPLIANCE

Title (en)

INTERRUPTING SUBASSEMBLY FOR SWITCHING APPLIANCE

Title (de)

BAUGRUPPE FÜR EINE SCHALTVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

SOUS-ENSEMBLE DE COUPURE POUR APPAREIL INTERRUPTEUR

Publication

EP 1256122 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 01907826 A

Priority

  • FR 0100467 W
  • FR 0002142 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0161717A1] The invention concerns a switching appliance comprising several main dual cut-out poles provided with fixed contacts housed in an arc box and mobile contacts located on a mobile contact-holder (30). The latter is equipped, for the main contacts, with main housings (31) aligned transversely to the direction (X) of displacement of the contact-holder (30), and, for the auxiliary contacts, secondary housings (32) aligned transversely to the direction (X) and located in front of the main housings (31). The contact-holder comprises between the main housings and the secondary housings a vertical insulating wall (35). The arc box consists of two half boxes (20, 40) assembled in a horizontal plane, so that one of the two halves provides guiding elements and stop elements for the contact-holder (30).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 50/54; H01H 50/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 50/04 (2006.01); H01H 50/54 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 50/546 (2013.01); H01H 50/045 (2013.01); H01H 50/541 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0161717A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0161717 A1 20010823; AU 3570201 A 20010827; BR 0108440 A 20030325; BR PI0108440 B1 20160308; CN 1214426 C 20050810; CN 1401128 A 20030305; DE 60123582 D1 20061116; DE 60123582 T2 20070816; EP 1256122 A1 20021113; EP 1256122 B1 20061004; ES 2273807 T3 20070516; FR 2805389 A1 20010824; FR 2805389 B1 20020412; US 2003001700 A1 20030102; US 6583694 B2 20030624

INPADOC legal status


2017-06-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170228

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170217

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170110

- Year of fee payment: 17

2007-09-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070705

2007-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2273807 T3

2006-11-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60123582 P 20061116

2006-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT

2006-10-04 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061004

2006-06-14 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES IT LI

2002-11-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020618

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI