Global Patent Index - EP 1256162 A1

EP 1256162 A1 2002-11-13 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR IMPROVING EFFICIENCY IN A SWITCHING REGULATOR AT LIGHT LOADS

Title (en)

METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR IMPROVING EFFICIENCY IN A SWITCHING REGULATOR AT LIGHT LOADS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERHÖHUNG DES WIRKUNGSGRADES EINES SCHALTREGLERS BEI GERINGER BELASTUNG

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET APPAREIL POUR L'AMELIORATION DU RENDEMENT DANS UN REGULATEUR A DECOUPAGE PRES DES CHARGES LEGERES.

Publication

EP 1256162 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01910877 A

Priority

  • US 0105133 W
  • US 60816100 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6212079B1] A switching regulator that operates at a frequency for a first range of feedback signal values and at a variable frequency without skipping cycles for a second range of feedback signal values. In one embodiment, a switching regulator for a switched mode power supply includes a power switch coupled between drain and source terminals of the switching regulator, which are to be coupled to control the delivery of power to an output of a power supply. A control terminal of the switching regulator is to be coupled to an output of the power supply. The switching regulator includes a control circuit coupled to the control terminal and generates a feedback signal that is responsive to the output of the power supply. The control circuit also generates a drive signal that is coupled to control the switching of the power switch. The control circuit generates the drive signal responsive to the feedback signal. The drive signal has a fixed frequency for a first range of feedback signal values and at a variable frequency without skipping cycles for a second range of feedback signal values.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H02M 3/335; G05F 1/56

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H02M 3/28 (2006.01); H02M 3/335 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H02M 3/33507 (2013.01); H02M 2001/0032 (2013.01); Y02B 70/16 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

US 6212079 B1 20010403; AU 3843801 A 20020114; EP 1256162 A1 20021113; EP 1256162 A4 20060412; EP 1256162 B1 20130605; EP 2276160 A2 20110119; EP 2276160 A3 20120222; EP 2276160 B1 20160824; EP 2276161 A2 20110119; EP 2276161 A3 20120125; EP 2276161 B1 20160921; JP 2004503198 A 20040129; JP 2010158167 A 20100715; JP 2012217336 A 20121108; JP 5411330 B2 20140212; JP 5584511 B2 20140903; WO 0203537 A1 20020110

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20180222

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180227

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-05-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20180227

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180227

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180227

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-03-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20180226

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-02-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-06-18 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 60148053

- Effective date: 20140306

2014-05-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20140306

2013-10-02 [REG NL T3] TRANSLATION FILES FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995

2013-09-10 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2013-08-01 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 60148053

- Effective date: 20130801

2013-06-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL SE

2013-06-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2008-10-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080903

2008-06-04 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT

- Owner name: POWER INTEGRATIONS, INC.

2006-04-12 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20060227

2005-01-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL SE

2002-11-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020531

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI