Global Patent Index - EP 1256253 A1

EP 1256253 A1 2002-11-13 - RADIO RESOURCE MANAGEMENT IN A COMMUNICATION SYSTEM

Title (en)

RADIO RESOURCE MANAGEMENT IN A COMMUNICATION SYSTEM

Title (de)

FUNKRESSOURCENVERWALTUNG IN EINEM KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM

Title (fr)

GESTION DES RESSOURCES RADIO DANS UN SYSTEME DE COMMUNICATIONS

Publication

EP 1256253 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01901172 A

Priority

  • EP 0100568 W
  • GB 0003369 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0162032A1] The present invention relates to a radio communication system and a method in the system. According to the method radio resources of the system are managed based on information of the bitrate that has been allocated for a station of the radio communication system.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04Q 7/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04J 13/04 (2006.01); H04B 7/005 (2006.01); H04L 12/28 (2006.01); H04W 28/18 (2009.01); H04W 52/34 (2009.01); H04W 52/12 (2009.01); H04W 52/24 (2009.01); H04W 52/26 (2009.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04W 28/18 (2013.01); H04W 52/34 (2013.01); H04W 52/12 (2013.01); H04W 52/24 (2013.01); H04W 52/26 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0162032A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0162032 A1 20010823; AU 2679201 A 20010827; BR 0108367 A 20030311; CN 1418447 A 20030514; EP 1256253 A1 20021113; GB 0003369 D0 20000405; JP 2003523671 A 20030805; JP 3846859 B2 20061115; US 2003171123 A1 20030911; US 7395069 B2 20080701

INPADOC legal status


2009-03-18 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080925

2008-06-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080514

2008-02-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS OY

2003-01-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: LAAKSO, JANNE

2003-01-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HOLMA, HARRI

2003-01-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: RAITOLA, MIKA

2003-01-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HEISKA, KARI

2002-11-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020812

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI