Global Patent Index - EP 1256285 A2

EP 1256285 A2 2002-11-13 - Cover for helmets

Title (en)

Cover for helmets

Title (de)

Überzug für Helm

Title (fr)

Enveloppe pour casque

Publication

EP 1256285 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02425283 A

Priority

IT RM20010095 U

Abstract (en)

The invention relates to a cover (1) for helmet (2), particularly for jet kind helmet (2), characterised in that it is comprised of at least partially elasticised material, having a shape conformable to the shape of the jet kind helmet (2), and in that it is provided with means (3) for coupling with the same helmet (2). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A42B 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A42B 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A42B 3/003 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1256285 A2 20021113; EP 1256285 A3 20030917; IT RM20010095 U1 20021111; IT RM20010095 V0 20010511

INPADOC legal status


2005-09-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050304

2004-10-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040824

2004-06-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-04-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040211

2003-09-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-09-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI