Global Patent Index - EP 1256287 A2

EP 1256287 A2 2002-11-13 - Rotating cylinder for an epilator

Title (en)

Rotating cylinder for an epilator

Title (de)

Drehzylinder für ein Epilationsgerät

Title (fr)

Cylindre rotatif pour un épilateur

Publication

EP 1256287 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02017888 A

Priority

  • DE 19823577 A
  • EP 99953271 A

Abstract (en)

Two or more neighboring clamp elements (5,6) are located in chamber (3) formed in the facing sides of two discs (1,1'). At least one element has associated elastic intermediate material layer, e.g. washer (4), for noise damping. The layer is paper and/or sandpaper and/or plastic and/or sponge rubber. Alternatively, there may be a noise damper disc of metal, esp. spring steel, or flexible plastic.

Abstract (de)

Es wird ein Drehzylinder für ein Epilationsgerät beschrieben, der wenigstens zwei benachbart zueinander angeordnete Klemmelemente (5, 6) aufweist, von denen wenigstens ein Klemmelement (5) durch zwei Druckstifte (16) wechselweise druckbeaufschlagt wird, wobei die Betätigung der Druckstifte (16) durch geeignete Steuermittel (61) bewirkt wird und den Druckstiften (16) eine Dämpfungsscheibe (63) zugeordnet ist, die die Druckstifte (16) in Richtung auf das zugeordnete Klemmelement elastisch belastet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A45D 26/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45D 26/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A45D 26/0028 (2013.01); A45D 2026/0085 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9960883 A2 19991202; WO 9960883 A3 20000217; AT 234578 T 20030415; AU 4266399 A 19991213; DE 19823577 A1 20000302; DE 59904634 D1 20030424; EP 1079709 A2 20010307; EP 1079709 B1 20030319; EP 1256287 A2 20021113; EP 1256287 A3 20070801; EP 1256287 B1 20150114; ES 2195625 T3 20031201; ES 2535439 T3 20150511; JP 2002516125 A 20020604; JP 4279459 B2 20090617; RU 2216263 C2 20031120; TR 200003490 T2 20010621; US 6451028 B1 20020917

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170602

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150531

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170516

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170413

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-06-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170512

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-13 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150525

2016-07-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 706538 T

- Effective date: 20150525

2016-04-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150525

2016-04-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150531

2016-01-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150531

2016-01-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150525

2015-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20150114

2015-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2015-12-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20151015

2015-10-15 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 59915420

2015-05-11 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2535439 T3

- Effective date: 20150511

2015-04-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-02-26 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 59915420

- Effective date: 20150226

2015-02-15 [REG AT REF] REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)

- Document: AT 706538 T

- Effective date: 20150215

2015-01-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2015-01-14 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1079709 P

2015-01-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2015-01-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2014-09-10 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20140813

2008-04-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2007-12-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20071122

2007-11-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070914

2007-08-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2002-11-13 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1079709

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL