Global Patent Index - EP 1256288 A1

EP 1256288 A1 2002-11-13 - Electrical power outlet socket strip and its use as insertable drawer piece

Title (en)

Electrical power outlet socket strip and its use as insertable drawer piece

Title (de)

Elektrische Anschlusssäule als Einschubteil

Title (fr)

Bloc multiprises à courant électrique utilisé en tant que tiroir escamotable

Publication

EP 1256288 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02009177 A

Priority

DE 10122123 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6416336B1] An electrical connection tower as a push-in part with a plurality of receptacle outlet inserts for system voltage connections and for information connections, an annular surround which is recessed in a table top engaging with guides in rails of the connection tower and a cover arranged on the top of the connection tower closing off the top side of the annular surround. The technical problem is that of providing a connection tower with a flush termination of the equipment plate in the unused state and ease of handling. The cover can be swung up counter to a prestressing force about a hinge pin aligned parallel to the plane of an insert plate of a receptacle outlet insert on the insertion side of the insert plates.

Abstract (de)

Eine elektrische Anschlußsäule als Einschubteil mit mehreren Steckdoseneinsätzen für Netzspannungsanschlüsse und für Informationsanschlüsse, wobei ein in eine Tischplatte eingelassener Ringmantel mit Führungen in Schienen der Anschlußsäule eingreift und wobei ein am Kopf der Anschlußsäule angeordneter Deckel die Kopfseite des Ringmantels abschließt. Das technische Problem ist die Bereitstellung einer Anschlußsäule mit einem bündigen Abschluß der Geräteplatte in unbenutztem Zustand und einer leichten Handhabbarkeit. Der Deckel (6) ist entgegen einer Vorspannung um einen parallel zur Ebene einer Einsatzplatte (25) eines Steckdoseneinsatzes (13) ausgerichteten Gelenkzapfen (23) auf der Einsteckseite der Einsatzplatten (25) hochschwenkbar. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 21/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 21/00 (2006.01); H01R 13/447 (2006.01); H01R 25/00 (2006.01); H01R 27/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 21/06 (2013.01); H01R 13/447 (2013.01); H01R 25/006 (2013.01); A47B 2021/068 (2013.01); H01R 27/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

US 6416336 B1 20020709; DE 10122123 A1 20021212; EP 1256288 A1 20021113; EP 1256288 B1 20050713

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170425

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170515

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170424

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-04-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-04-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2006-06-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060418

2006-04-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-11-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20051010

2005-08-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50203606 P 20050818

2005-07-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2005-07-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-07-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-07-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030510

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI