Global Patent Index - EP 1256289 A2

EP 1256289 A2 2002-11-13 - Securing member for a supporting arm movable within a vertical guide

Title (en)

Securing member for a supporting arm movable within a vertical guide

Title (de)

Befestigungselement für einen beweglichen tragenden Arm in einer vertikalen Führung

Title (fr)

Membre de fixation pour un bras de support mobile dans un guide vertical

Publication

EP 1256289 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02075749 A

Priority

NL 1018019 A

Abstract (en)

The invention relates to an assembly having a vertical guide comprising a base part provided with spaced-apart holes, raised edge portions and legs turned towards each other on said edge portions, supporting arms movable within said vertical guide and securing members by which said supporting arms can be secured within the vertical guide. Said securing members can be placed in the holes with a stub and will come to bear against the inner side of the guide with their cams by rotation, in which a supporting arm will come to bear on said securing member through an obliquely extending contact surface. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 57/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 57/48 (2006.01); A47B 57/56 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 57/48 (2013.01); A47B 57/562 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

WO 9209221 A1 19920611 - BRITANNIA SHELVING LTD [GB]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1256289 A2 20021113; EP 1256289 A3 20040728; NL 1018019 C1 20021112

INPADOC legal status


2008-09-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080320

2007-12-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20071109

2005-04-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2005-03-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030508

2004-07-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-07-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-09-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WIJNANS, ARTHUR CHRISTIAAN

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI