Global Patent Index - EP 1256291 A2

EP 1256291 A2 2002-11-13 - Bracket for furniture elements and the like

Title (en)

Bracket for furniture elements and the like

Title (de)

Träger für Möbelelemente und dergleichen

Title (fr)

Console pour des éléments de meuble et similaires

Publication

EP 1256291 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02076738 A

Priority

IT MI20010262 U

Abstract (en)

Bracket for furniture elements and the like, comprising an arm (10;210;310) and supporting and fastening means (20), said arm (10) being of the tubular type and said supporting and fastening means consisting of an L-shaped dihedron provided with means (23) for guiding and means (24, 25) for locking the tubular element (10). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 96/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 96/02 (2006.01); A47B 96/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 96/061 (2013.01); A47B 96/027 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1256291 A2 20021113; EP 1256291 A3 20050112; IT MI20010262 U1 20021111; IT MI20010262 V0 20010510

INPADOC legal status


2010-06-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20091201

2009-12-04 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1050987

2005-09-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2005-08-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050704

2005-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2005-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI