Global Patent Index - EP 1256292 A1

EP 1256292 A1 2002-11-13 - An adjustable office chair

Title (en)

An adjustable office chair

Title (de)

Stuhl, insbesondere Bürostuhl

Title (fr)

Une chaise de bureau ajustable

Publication

EP 1256292 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02010373 A

Priority

DE 10122948 A

Abstract (en)

The upper pivot point (D3) linking the seat rod (7) to the seating surface (6) lies closer (a) to the backrest (5) than (b) the bottom pivot point (D2) linking rod (7) and seat support (3). Slide guide (10) between seat rod (7) and backrest support (4) maintains their synchronism. Thus backrest and seat surface (6) are synchronized in movement by a rod-fitted driver bolt (10a) riding in the slot (10b) provided in the backrest support. A second slide guide (8) slides downwards towards the seat support (3) in the forward part (6a) of the seating surface (6).

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Stuhl (1), insbesondere einem Bürostuhl, mit einer über einen Lehnenträger (4) an einem Sitzträger (3) angelenkten Rückenlehne (5) und mit einer synchron hierzu bewegbaren Sitzfläche (6), deren vorderer Bereich (6a) über eine Schiebeführung (8) und deren hinterer Bereich (6b) über einen Sitzlenker (7) mit dem Sitzträger (3) verbunden ist, ist der Abstand (a) des den Sitzlenker (7) mit der Sitzfläche (6) verbindenden oberen Drehpunktes (D3) zur Rückenlehne (5) kleiner als der Abstand (b) des den Sitzlenker (7) mit dem Sitzträger (3) verbindenden unteren Drehpunktes (D2) zur Rückenlehne (5). Zur Synchronisation zwischen der Bewegung der Rückenlehne (5) und der Bewegung der Sitzfläche (6) ist eine Schiebeführung (10) zwischen dem Sitzlenker (7) und dem Lehnenträger (4) vorgesehen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 1/032

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 1/032 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 1/03294 (2013.01); A47C 1/03255 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1256292 A1 20021113; DE 10122948 C1 20030313; US 2002167209 A1 20021114; US 6896329 B2 20050524

INPADOC legal status


2008-01-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070703

2007-03-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070201

2003-09-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030509

2003-09-24 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-09-04 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-07-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-02-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SANDER, ARMIN

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI