Global Patent Index - EP 1256294 A2

EP 1256294 A2 2002-11-13 - Chair, particularly office chair

Title (en)

Chair, particularly office chair

Title (de)

Stuhl, insbesondere Bürostuhl

Title (fr)

Chaise, notamment chaise de bureau

Publication

EP 1256294 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02010436 A

Priority

DE 10122945 A

Abstract (en)

The rear seat rod (8), rotatably joined to the seating surface (6) via pivot (5) and via a lower pivot point (D6) to the seat support (2), lies at an angle and the top pivot point (D5) is closer to the backrest (4) than the bottom pivot point (D6). The angled front rod (7) joined to the front half (6a) of the seating surface is joined to the surface (6) through pivot point (D3) and also joined to the seat support (2) through a bottom pivot (D2), itself arranged further from the backrest (4) than pivot point (D3). Rod (8) is more steeply angled than rod (7). One of the pivot points (D5,D6) of the coupling rod (14) is provided in the surface (4) half (6b) where this faces the backrest (4).

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Stuhl (1), insbesondere einen Bürostuhl, mit einer über einem Lehnenträger (3) an einem Sitzträger (2) neigbar gehaltenen Rückenlehne (4) und mit einer Sitzfläche (6), die sich über mindestens einen Sitzlenker (7,8) am Sitzträger (2) abstützt, ist zur Synchronisation zwischen der Bewegung der Rückenlehne (4) und der Bewegung der Sitzfläche (6) ein mit der Sitzfläche (6) und mit dem Lehnenlenker (3) drehbar verbundener Koppellenker (14) vorgesehen. Zur Absenkung der Sitzfläche (6) bei der Synchronbewegung ist der mit der Sitzfläche (6) über einen oberen Drehpunkt (D5) und mit dem Sitzträger (2) über einen unteren Drehpunkt (D4) drehbeweglich verbundene hintere Sitzlenker (8) nach vorne unten geneigt angeordnet, wobei der Abstand des oberen Drehpunktes (D5) zur Rückenlehne (4) kleiner ist als der Abstand des unteren Drehpunktes (D4). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 1/032

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 1/032 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 1/03294 (2013.01); A47C 1/03255 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1256294 A2 20021113; EP 1256294 A3 20040121; EP 1256294 B1 20040922; AT 276690 T 20041015; DE 10122945 A1 20021212; ES 2227356 T3 20050401; US 2004026973 A1 20040212; US 6709057 B2 20040323

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170601

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170519

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170524

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170524

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170523

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170522

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170524

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-06-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170522

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-05-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-05-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050222

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SANDER ARMIN

- Effective date: 20050531

2007-10-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: KOENIG + NEURATH AG

- Free text: KOENIG + NEURATH AG#INDUSTRIESTRASSE 1#61184 KARBEN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- KOENIG + NEURATH AG#INDUSTRIESTRASSE 1#61184 KARBEN (DE)

2006-03-16 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

2005-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SANDER ARMIN

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-10-28 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2005-10-03 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: KOENIG + NEURATH AG

- Effective date: 20050711

2005-09-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050623

2005-09-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-08-17 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2005-07-29 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: KOENIG + NEURATH AG

- Free text: SANDER, ARMIN#HOCHSTRASSE 15A#90429 NUERNBERG (DE) -TRANSFER TO- KOENIG + NEURATH AG#INDUSTRIESTRASSE 1#61184 KARBEN (DE)

2005-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-05-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-05-08 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050508

2005-05-08 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050508

2005-04-20 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2227356 T3

2005-02-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050111

2004-12-22 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041222

2004-12-22 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041222

2004-12-22 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041222

2004-10-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50201066 P 20041028

2004-10-20 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-10-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-09-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-09-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-09-22 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040922

2004-09-22 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040922

2004-09-22 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040922

2004-09-15 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: CHAIR, PARTICULARLY OFFICE CHAIR

2004-03-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040109

2004-01-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-01-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-02-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SANDER, ARMIN

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI