Global Patent Index - EP 1256295 A2

EP 1256295 A2 2002-11-13 - Arrangement for screening and/or climatization and/or tempering of a lying surface in particular for a bed

Title (en)

Arrangement for screening and/or climatization and/or tempering of a lying surface in particular for a bed

Title (de)

Anordnung zum Abschirmen und/oder Klimatisieren und/oder Temperieren einer Liegefläche wie die eines Bettes

Title (fr)

Système de mise à l'abri et/ou de climatisation et/ou de températion d'une surface de couchage notamment d'un lit

Publication

EP 1256295 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02010119 A

Priority

DE 20107882 U

Abstract (en)

The thick board (32, 34) has to be cut in one piece in at least the size of the area (16, 18) occupied by a person lying on a bed (10). It is positioned underneath the bed (10) either directly on the floor (22) or on a low stand, but still at a distance from the lower surface (44) of the actual bed (10), in the way it has been part of the tree, the upper end (4) below the head (42) of the user, the lower end (36) under his/her feet (38). The contours of the board (32, 34) can be rectangular, oval or provided with particularly shaped corners.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung bezieht sich auf eine Anordnung zum Abschirmen und Klimatisieren einer Liegefläche (16, 18). Um mit natürlichen Mitteln eine Liegefläche (16, 18) abzuschirmen bzw. zu klimatisieren, wird vorgeschlagen, dass unterhalb der Liegefläche (16,18) ein cinstückig aus Massivholz bestehendes Holzelement (32, 34) einer Flächcnerstreckung angeordnet ist, die zumindest in etwa wirksamer genutzter Liegefläche entspricht. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 19/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 21/04 (2006.01); A47C 27/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 31/004 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 20107882 U1 20011018; EP 1256295 A2 20021113; EP 1256295 A3 20030917

INPADOC legal status


2004-12-15 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040318

2004-07-15 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-06-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-09-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-09-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI