Global Patent Index - EP 1256304 A2

EP 1256304 A2 2002-11-13 - Shower cabin

Title (en)

Shower cabin

Title (de)

Duschkabine

Title (fr)

Cabine de douche

Publication

EP 1256304 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02018475 A

Priority

  • DE 19710785 A
  • EP 97122017 A

Abstract (en)

A shower cubicle comprises a shower tray (23), at least one fixed wall (12), and a door (13). A shower cubicle comprises a shower tray (23), at least one fixed wall (12), and a door (13). The tray consists of plastic, especially polymethyl methacrylate (PMMA), and an inorganic filler material, especially quartz. The wall and door are made of glass or transparent plastic. The top of the tray, in the area that contacts the tiles on the shower wall, has a width such that the surface of the tiles passes without a step to the inside of the tray.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung bezieht sich auf eine Duschkabine, mit einer Duschwanne (23), wenigstens einem feststehenden Wandteil (12) und einer Tür (13), wobei die Duschwanne (23) vorzugsweise aus Kunststoff mit Hilfe einer Matrize gegossen ist, sowie der feststehende Wandteil (12) und die Tür (13) vorzugsweise aus Glas oder durchsichtigem Kunststoff bestehen, wobei u. a. die Oberseite (18) des Wannenrandes (28) im Bereich einer mit Fliesen (26) belegten Gebäudewand (25) eine so geringe Breite hat, dass die Oberflächen (60) der Fliesen (26) stufenlos in die Innenfläche (63) des Wannenrandes (28) übergehen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47K 3/28; A47K 3/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47K 3/00 (2006.01); A47K 3/36 (2006.01); A47K 3/40 (2006.01); A47K 3/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05F 1/061 (2013.01); A47K 3/008 (2013.01); A47K 3/36 (2013.01); A47K 3/40 (2013.01); A47K 2003/305 (2013.01); A47K 2003/365 (2013.01); A47K 2003/367 (2013.01); E05D 7/081 (2013.01); E05D 7/083 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/114 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0865752 A2 19980923; EP 0865752 A3 19990210; EP 0865752 B1 20030514; DE 19710785 A1 19980924; DE 19710785 C2 20020926; EP 1256304 A2 20021113; EP 1256304 A3 20021127; EP 1256304 B1 20040421; EP 1374749 A1 20040102; EP 1374749 B1 20050406

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071213

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071231

2008-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071213

2008-11-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20081020

2008-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080701

2008-08-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20071213

2007-02-23 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070223

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061231

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-12-18 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20061218

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-12-15 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20061215

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-04-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050124

2004-12-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-10-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2004-08-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040802

2004-08-01 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040801

2004-05-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59711554 P 20040527

2004-04-21 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 0865752 P

2004-04-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2004-04-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-04-21 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040421

2003-08-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2003-05-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030328

2003-04-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030130

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2002-11-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 47K 3/28 A, 7A 47K 3/40 B, 7A 47K 3/36 B

2002-11-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: DIJKHUIZEN, OKKO KORNELIS

2002-11-13 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 865752

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL