Global Patent Index - EP 1256328 A1

EP 1256328 A1 2002-11-13 - Straw for the preservation of small amounts of substances, in particular of biological liquids

Title (en)

Straw for the preservation of small amounts of substances, in particular of biological liquids

Title (de)

Röhrchen zum Aufbewahren kleiner Mengen von Substanzen, besonders von biologischen Flüssigkeiten

Title (fr)

Paillette pour la conservation de petites quantités de substances, en particulier de liquides biologiques

Publication

EP 1256328 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 02291040 A

Priority

FR 0106081 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2824256A1] New small tube, for conserving minute quantities of biological substances, comprises plug containing gelling powder, including a mixed portion of dispersed non-absorbent material.

Abstract (fr)

Paillette (1) pour la conservation de petites quantités de substances, notamment des substances biologiques, se composant d'un segment de tube muni à l'intérieur de l'une de ses extrémités d'un bouchon comportant de la poudre gélifiante, caractérisée en ce qu'une partie de la poudre gélifiante est remplacée par de la matière non absorbante sous forme dispersée, ledit bouchon comprenant ainsi un mélange de poudre gélifiante et de matière non absorbante sous forme dispersée. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61D 19/02; B01L 3/02; B01L 3/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61J 1/00 (2006.01); A61D 19/02 (2006.01); A61J 1/05 (2006.01); A61J 1/06 (2006.01); B01L 3/00 (2006.01); B61D 19/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61D 19/024 (2013.01); A46B 11/001 (2013.01); B01L 3/502707 (2013.01); B01L 2300/042 (2013.01); B01L 2300/069 (2013.01); B01L 2300/0838 (2013.01); B01L 2400/0406 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1256328 A1 20021113; CA 2382339 A1 20021107; CA 2382339 C 20070410; CN 1271983 C 20060830; CN 1383796 A 20021211; FR 2824256 A1 20021108; FR 2824256 B1 20040402; JP 2002345926 A 20021203; JP 4257070 B2 20090422; KR 20020086240 A 20021118; MX PA02004543 A 20021120; PL 200269 B1 20081231; PL 353724 A1 20021118; RU 2002111844 A 20040120; RU 2233756 C2 20040810; TW I255737 B 20060601; US 2002188222 A1 20021212; US 7252988 B2 20070807

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-16 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20180416

2018-05-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A46B 11/00 19680901AFI20180329BHEP

2010-03-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20100128

2003-07-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-07-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030426

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI