Global Patent Index - EP 1256333 A2

EP 1256333 A2 2002-11-13 - Invalid chair

Title (en)

Invalid chair

Title (de)

Krankenstuhl

Title (fr)

Fauteuil pour invalide

Publication

EP 1256333 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02010049 A

Priority

IT PD20010107 A

Abstract (en)

It is a seating for disabled persons suffering from skeletal malformations, which can assist in obtaining a correct posture, or at least a support for the posture. <??>The part specifically innovative of the seat concerns the backrest, which consists of a plurality of parts, each allowing to be adjusted according to all six freedom degrees, in order to make up the more suitable rest and/or support for said malformations. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61G 5/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61F 5/02 (2006.01); A61G 5/12 (2006.01); A61G 5/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61G 5/12 (2013.01); A61G 5/1054 (2016.11); A61G 5/1067 (2013.01); A61G 5/1091 (2016.11); A61G 5/121 (2016.11); A61G 5/122 (2016.11); A61G 5/1075 (2013.01); A61G 2210/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1256333 A2 20021113; EP 1256333 A3 20031008; IT PD20010107 A1 20021107

INPADOC legal status


2005-01-05 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040410

2004-08-05 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-06-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-10-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-10-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI