Global Patent Index - EP 1256334 A2

EP 1256334 A2 2002-11-13 - Apparatus for lifting

Title (en)

Apparatus for lifting

Title (de)

Hebevorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de levage

Publication

EP 1256334 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02253218 A

Priority

GB 0111208 A

Abstract (en)

Apparatus (10) for lifting the body of a person includes a carrier bar (20) with a respective end bar (30) at each end thereof. The ends of the end bars (30) are provided with a respective latch (32) for engaging a peripheral lip of a tray on which the body that is to be lifted rests. The apparatus (10) also includes a pivot member (40) which is suspended from a cable of a crane and which is operable to engage structure of the lifting apparatus (10) so as to lift the apparatus (10) and the tray engaged thereby. The pivot member (40) is selectively positionable relative to the apparatus (10), so as to maintain the tray, and the body thereon, substantially horizontal. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61G 7/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61G 7/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61G 7/1055 (2013.01); A61G 7/1069 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1256334 A2 20021113; EP 1256334 A3 20040414; GB 0111208 D0 20010627

INPADOC legal status


2005-07-06 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041015

2005-02-10 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2005-01-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2004-04-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-04-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI