Global Patent Index - EP 1256374 A2

EP 1256374 A2 2002-11-13 - Stirring device

Title (en)

Stirring device

Title (de)

Rührgerät

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'agitation

Publication

EP 1256374 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02006958 A

Priority

DE 20107968 U

Abstract (en)

The stirring implement has a motor (2) driven shaft (9) with a stirring head attached releasably to it. The stirring head has a plug in connection (3,5) socket engaged by a pin on the drive output for the motor. The plug in connection has stop lugs to allow hand fitting and release of the drive. The drive pin has a slot to receive a drive pin on the base of the socket.

Abstract (de)

Ein Rührgerät, dem mindestens ein Rührstab (9) zugeordnet ist, weist für jeden Rührstab (9) eine motorisch antreibbare Antriebswelle (3) auf, die einen am Rührgerät vorstehend angeordneten Verbindungs-Endbereich (5) bildet, mit dem der Endbereich (7) des jeweiligen Rührstabes (9) lösbar verbindbar ist. Einer der Endbereiche bildet einen Einsteckzapfen (15) und der jeweils andere Endbereich eine in axialer Richtung von Antriebswelle und Rührstab auf den Einsteckzapfen (15) steckbare Aufsteckbuchse (16), wobei der Einsteckzapfen (15) und die Aufsteckbuchse (16) beim Zusammenstecken mittels einer Rasteinrichtung (17, 18) von Hand lösbar miteinander verrasten und mittels einer Drehmitnahmeeinrichtung (30, 31) in Drehmitnahmeeingriff miteinander gelangen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01F 15/00; B01F 7/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01F 13/00 (2006.01); B01F 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01F 15/0048 (2013.01); B01F 13/002 (2013.01); B01F 2215/0047 (2013.01); B01F 2215/005 (2013.01); B01F 2215/006 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 20107968 U1 20010809; EP 1256374 A2 20021113; EP 1256374 A3 20041110

INPADOC legal status


2005-11-30 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-07-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2005-03-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050118

2005-02-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20041218

2004-11-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-11-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-11-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 01F 15/00 A

2004-11-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 01F 7/16 B

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI