Global Patent Index - EP 1256386 A2

EP 1256386 A2 2002-11-13 - Booth for spraying powder onto workpieces

Title (en)

Booth for spraying powder onto workpieces

Title (de)

Kabine zur Pulverbeschichtung von Werkstücken

Title (fr)

Cabine de poudrage de pièces

Publication

EP 1256386 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02001679 A

Priority

DE 20107767 U

Abstract (en)

The booth has a manual coating station(30) located beyond and close to the workpiece through-passage when viewed in the transporting direction(T) of the workpieces. The manual coating station is located upstream of a first through-passage, and an additional manual coating station(40) is provided in a second end wall downstream of a second through-passage for the workpieces. A suction pipe opens out into the interior of the booth via a suction opening below the standing base(34) in the end wall(14,20).

Abstract (de)

Eine Kabine zur Pulverbeschichtung von Werkstücken (W), die durch eine Durchtrittsöffnung (16) für die Werkstücke in einer Stirnwand (14) transportiert und mittels automatischer Sprühvorrichtungen innerhalb der Kabine beschichtet werden, wobei in der Kabine ein Unterdruck herrscht, hat mindestens einen Handbeschichtungsplatz (30) in Transportrichtung der Werkstücke jenseits und benachbart der Durchtrittsöffnung(16) zum Handbeschichten von Werkstücken außerhalb der Kabine, was einerseits Öffnungen in den Seitenwänden der Kabine zum Handbeschichten der Werkstücke von der Seite der Kabine her erübrigt und andererseits einen praktisch unbegrenzten Freiraum beim Handbeschichten eröffnet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05B 15/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 15/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05B 16/90 (2018.02); B05B 16/25 (2018.02); B05B 16/40 (2018.02); B05B 14/48 (2018.02); Y10S 118/07 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 20107767 U1 20010712; DE 50212373 D1 20080731; EP 1256386 A2 20021113; EP 1256386 A3 20050112; EP 1256386 B1 20080618; ES 2307677 T3 20081201; US 2002166506 A1 20021114; US 6743295 B2 20040601

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170125

2018-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20180122

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180202

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171211

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-12-11 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-11-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170125

2017-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170124

2017-11-28 [REG DE R079] AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS

- Document: DE 50212373

- Free text: PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: B05B0015120000

- IPC: B05B0016000000

2017-09-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20170124

2016-12-15 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-05-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160112

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160120

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-02-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20151214

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-12-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-06-28 [REG DE R100] EPO DECISION MAINTAINING PATENT UNAMENDED NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 50212373

- Effective date: 20111018

2012-05-09 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 20111018

2009-04-29 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: ITW GEMA GMBH

- Effective date: 20090318

2008-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2307677 T3

2008-09-30 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2008-07-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50212373 P 20080731

2008-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2008-06-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2008-05-14 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2007-01-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061204

2005-09-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT SE

2005-09-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050708

2005-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2005-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI