Global Patent Index - EP 1256390 A2

EP 1256390 A2 2002-11-13 - A process for multi-layer coating

Title (en)

A process for multi-layer coating

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Mehrschichtbeschichtung

Title (fr)

Procédé servant à appliquer un revêtement multicouche

Publication

EP 1256390 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02006450 A

Priority

US 85237901 A

Abstract (en)

A process for the production of a multi-layer coating, wherein a primer layer which is electrically conductive in the at least partially cured state is applied by electrodeposition from an electrodeposition coating agent (I) to an electrically conductive three-dimensional object, at least partially cured exclusively by the action of near infra-red radiation substantially only on the surfaces of the object exposed to the radiation, and an additional coating layer is applied by electrodeposition from an electrodeposition coating agent (II) which is different from electrodeposition coating agent (I), and then this additional coating layer as well as completely uncured or incompletely cured area parts of the primer layer produced from electrodeposition coating agent (I) are cured.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05D 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05D 1/36 (2006.01); B05D 3/02 (2006.01); B05D 7/00 (2006.01); C25D 13/00 (2006.01); B05D 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05D 7/546 (2013.01); B05D 3/0263 (2013.01); C25D 13/00 (2013.01); B05D 1/007 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1256390 A2 20021113; EP 1256390 A3 20031119; EP 1256390 B1 20060322; DE 60209953 D1 20060511; DE 60209953 T2 20061123; JP 2002363791 A 20021218; US 2002166770 A1 20021114; US 6508922 B2 20030121

INPADOC legal status


2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081001

2008-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060322

2008-08-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060331

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070309

2007-04-27 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2007-03-15 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070315

- Year of fee payment: 6

2007-02-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20061227

2006-07-03 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060703

2006-05-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60209953 P 20060511

2006-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2006-03-22 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060322

2005-05-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050404

2004-08-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2004-04-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040217

2003-11-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-11-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI