Global Patent Index - EP 1256419 A1

EP 1256419 A1 2002-11-13 - Method and device for protecting an hydraulic impact tool against the effects of idling

Title (en)

Method and device for protecting an hydraulic impact tool against the effects of idling

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Absicherung eines fluidbetriebenen Schlagwerks gegen Leerschläge

Title (fr)

Méthode et pour la protection d'un outil de percussion hydraulique contre les effects des frappes à vide

Publication

EP 1256419 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02009176 A

Priority

DE 10123202 A

Abstract (en)

A percussion piston (3) movable in an operating cylinder (2) and hitting a tool (4) has two differently-sized piston surfaces the smaller of which is connected to a pressure line (8), and the larger is connected to the pressure line and a return flow line by means of a control valve (5) which contains a movable control slide piece (5a) which has two differently sized surfaces. The interior (2d) of the operating cylinder contains a void impact inlet (20a). The input side of a safety device (21) is connected with the pressure line and is in the form of a two-position valve with a re-setting (23). A control surface signal line (21a) is exposed to a pressure level forming a control signal.

Abstract (de)

Abhängig von den Arbeits- und Einsatzbedingungen ist es unter Umständen wünschenswert, fluidbetriebene Schlagwerke - insbesondere unter dem Gesichtspunkt der Vermeidung einer unerwünschten Beanspruchung - mit einer Leerschlagsicherung auszustatten. Diese ist im vorliegenden Fall derart ausgebildet, daß unter Einwirkung eines Sicherungselements in Form eines Mehrstellungsventils die die Schlagkolbenbewegungen beeinflussende Steuerung in der Arbeitshubstellung blockiert wird und dadurch das Schlagwerk stillsetzt, falls der Schlagkolben die sich im Normalbetrieb ergebende Ausfahrstellung in Arbeitshubrichtung um ein vorgegebenes Wegstück bis zur Einnahme einer Leerschlagstellung überfährt. Mit der Erfindung wird der Vorschlag unterbreitet, das auf die Steuerung (5) des Schlagwerks (1) einwirkende Sicherungselement (21) selbsttätig gesteuert auszubilden, und zwar derart, daß es erst zeitversetzt zur Inbetriebnahme des dabei mit Arbeitsdruck beaufschlagten Schlagwerks (1) wirksam geschaltet wird. Das Schlagwerk (1) kann somit zunächst ohne Beeinflussungsmöglichkeit durch das Sicherungselement (21) anlaufen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25D 9/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25D 17/10 (2006.01); B25D 9/26 (2006.01); F15B 11/15 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25D 9/265 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FI FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1256419 A1 20021113; EP 1256419 B1 20090415; DE 10123202 A1 20021114; DE 50213438 D1 20090528; ES 2325765 T3 20090916; JP 2003025251 A 20030129; JP 4118594 B2 20080716; US 2002185285 A1 20021212; US 6672403 B2 20040106

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-08-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170517

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-08-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20170412

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170424

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170419

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170419

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170419

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-04-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-04-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-03-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20100118

2009-09-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2325765 T3

2009-05-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50213438 P 20090528

2009-04-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FI FR GB IT

2009-04-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-09-04 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-08-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030701

2003-08-27 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE ES FI FR GB IT

2003-07-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-01-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ATLAS COPCO CONSTRUCTION TOOLS GMBH

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI