Global Patent Index - EP 1256423 A2

EP 1256423 A2 2002-11-13 - Device for accomodating a retractable slicing machine

Title (en)

Device for accomodating a retractable slicing machine

Title (de)

Aufnahmevorrichtung für eine herausklappbare Alleschneidmaschine

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour accueillir une machine à débiter en tranches escamotable

Publication

EP 1256423 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02010530 A

Priority

DE 10122881 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE10122881C1] The container in the form of a trough is contained in a recess (3) in a kitchen work surface (4) , table-top , work-bench or other surface and is covered by a lid (11). When the all-purpose cutter (1) is not operating, the entire container extends downwards from the work surface to where it does not impede the movement of the other built-in fitments such as drawers.

Abstract (de)

Vorrichtung zur herausklappbaren Aufnahme einer Allesschneidemaschine in einer Ausnehmung einer Arbeitsplatte einer Kücheneinrichtung, einer Tischplatte, einer Werkbank oder dergleichen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B26D 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26D 1/143 (2006.01); B26D 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26D 7/00 (2013.01); B26D 1/143 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 10122881 C1 20020725; EP 1256423 A2 20021113; EP 1256423 A3 20030723

INPADOC legal status


2006-06-07 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060105

2005-01-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: STEINKE, WERNER

2004-10-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040826

2004-04-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-02-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031217

2003-07-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-07-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI