Global Patent Index - EP 1256424 A2

EP 1256424 A2 2002-11-13 - Apparatus for cutting flexible material

Title (en)

Apparatus for cutting flexible material

Title (de)

Gerät zum Schneiden von flexiblem Schneidgut

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour la coupe d'un matériau flexible

Publication

EP 1256424 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02405313 A

Priority

CH 8312001 A

Abstract (en)

The cutter (1) incorporates a clamp (5) which has two arms (51,52) which can swivel in relation to each other on one plane. The clamp arms exert pressure on the goods being cut up in a decreasing extent in the direction of cutting. the two clamp arms form two facing sides of a deformable rectangle whose sides (51-54) are linked in pairs in the corners (55-58).

Abstract (de)

Das Gerät (1) zum Schneiden von flexiblem Schneidgut (8), bspw. von Isolationsplatten insbesondere aus Fasermaterial, beinhaltet eine Klemmeinrichtung (4) für das Schneidgut (8), welche zwei Klemmarme (51, 52) umfasst. Die Klemmarme (51, 52) sind relativ zueinander derart schwenkbar, dass ein Abstand der beiden Klemmarme (51, 52) veränderlich ist. Die Klemmeinrichtung (5) ist derart ausgebildet, dass die Klemmarme (51, 52) auf das Schneidgut (8) einen in Schneidrichtung abnehmenden Klemmdruck (p1, p2) ausüben, d. h. der Abstand der Klemmarme (51, 52) nimmt in Schneidrichtung, nach unten hin, zu. Ein Verrutschen bzw. Ausweichen des Schneidgutes (8) insbesondere beim kritischen Eindringen des Schneidwerkzeugs (3) ins Schneidgut (8) wird so verhindert. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B26D 7/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26D 7/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26D 7/025 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1256424 A2 20021113; EP 1256424 A3 20040818

INPADOC legal status


2005-12-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050221

2005-06-16 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2005-05-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2004-08-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-08-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI