Global Patent Index - EP 1256425 A1

EP 1256425 A1 2002-11-13 - Wood chip board

Title (en)

Wood chip board

Title (de)

Holzspanplatte

Title (fr)

Panneau de copeaux

Publication

EP 1256425 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02405385 A

Priority

CH 8362001 A

Abstract (en)

The proportion of wood in the particle board consists at least in part of wood shavings, or of a mixture of sawdust and wood shavings. The upper and or lower sides of the particle-board are coated, varnished or lacquered with a plastic layer or plastic sheet.

Abstract (de)

Die Verwendung der neuartigen Holzspanplatte ist vorzugsweise im Möbelbau vorgesehen. Sie ist im wesentlichen dadurch gekennzeichnet, dass ihr Holzanteil mindestens zum Teil aus Hobelspänen mit einer Spanlänge von beispielsweise 1 cm bis 20 cm besteht, die unter Druck und Hitze mit Kunstharzbindemitteln verdichtet und zusammengepresst sind. Die Hobelspäne, welche in verschieden Formen und Längen in der erfindungsgemässen Holzspanplatte vorhanden sind, zeigen gesamthaft eine mittlere Spanlänge von 3 cm bis 12 cm auf.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B27N 3/04; B27N 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B27N 3/04 (2006.01); B27N 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B27N 3/04 (2013.01); B27N 7/005 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Citation (third parties)

Third party :

  • DE 29722941 U1 19980305 - HARTMANN MANFRED DIPL OEK DIPL [DE]
  • US 3164511 A 19650105 - ARMIN ELMENDORF
  • LOUISIANA PACIFIC AND DYNO CREATE A MARKET LEADER
  • DUKE-EVANS D.G.: "ORIENTED STRAND BOARD - AT HOME IN EUROPE", FORBAIRT SYMPOSIUM, 17 June 1996 (1996-06-17), DUBLIN, pages 1 - 17, XP002959761
  • "OSB - ORIENTED STRAND BOARD", 2000, CENTRUM HOUT, NETHERLANDS, ISBN: 90-7638-397-9

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1256425 A1 20021113; CH 692844 A5 20021129

INPADOC legal status


2005-01-12 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040610

2003-07-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-04-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030226

2003-02-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BARD, MARKUS

2003-01-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021203

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI