Global Patent Index - EP 1256426 A1

EP 1256426 A1 2002-11-13 - Device for spreading particles, in particular wooden chips, wooden fibers or the like on a coveyor belt

Title (en)

Device for spreading particles, in particular wooden chips, wooden fibers or the like on a coveyor belt

Title (de)

Streugutanlage zum Streuen von Streugut, insbesondere von Holzspänen, Holzfasern o. dgl. auf einen Streubandförderer

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour répandre des particules, particulièrement copeaux de bois, fibres de bois ou semblable sur une bande transporteuse

Publication

EP 1256426 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02009113 A

Priority

DE 10122971 A

Abstract (en)

A hopper (3) has a dispenser unit for spreading the wood chippings (1) and such like onto a spreader roll track (6) positioned above the conveyor belt (2). The track has at least one ejector part (7) for fine material, after which is an ejector part for (8) coarse material. The coarse material ejector part has a distributor roll (10) rotating at a higher speed than the fine material distributor rolls (9).

Abstract (de)

Es handelt sich um eine Streugutanlage zum Streuen von Holzspänen auf einen Streubandförderer, mit einer oberhalb des Streubandförderers angeordneten Streuwalzenstraße mit einem Feingut-Abwurfbereich und einem Grobgut-Abwurfbereich. Der Grobgut-Abwurfbereich weist zumindest eine mit im Vergleich zu den Streuwalzen des Feingut-Abwurfbereiches erhöhter Drehgeschwindigkeit umlaufende Streuwalze auf, so dass das Grobgut unterseitig in den Feingut-Abwurfbereich zurückgeworfen wird und dort ein inniges Gemisch von Feingut und Grobgut unter Bildung der Mittelschicht entsteht. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B27N 3/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B27N 3/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B27N 3/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1256426 A1 20021113; EP 1256426 B1 20071226; CA 2385894 A1 20021111; CA 2385894 C 20061003; CN 1207177 C 20050622; CN 1421365 A 20030604; DE 10122971 A1 20021114; DE 50211420 D1 20080207; US 2002168441 A1 20021114; US 6780002 B2 20040824

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170428

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170503

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-02-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160425

2017-01-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160424

2016-11-29 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2015-07-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20150427

- Year of fee payment: 14

2015-07-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20150423

- Year of fee payment: 14

2015-01-08 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SIEMPELKAMP MASCHINEN- UND ANLAGENBAU GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SIEMPELKAMP MASCHINEN- UND ANLAGENBAU GMBH & CO. KG, 47803 KREFELD, DE

- Document: DE 50211420

- Effective date: 20141202

2015-01-08 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50211420

- Representative's name: ANDREJEWSKI - HONKE PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20141202

2014-12-02 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50211420

- Representative's name: ANDREJEWSKI - HONKE PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE, DE

2008-12-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080929

2008-04-15 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2008-02-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50211420 P 20080207

2007-12-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FI IT SE

2003-07-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FI IT SE

2003-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021025

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI