Global Patent Index - EP 1256428 A2

EP 1256428 A2 2002-11-13 - Method for loading ceramic tile forming moulds, a plant for its implementation, and tiles obtained thereby

Title (en)

Method for loading ceramic tile forming moulds, a plant for its implementation, and tiles obtained thereby

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Füllen von Formen für Fliesen, Vorrichtung zur Anwendung des Verfahrens und mittels des Verfahrens hergestellte Fliesen

Title (fr)

Procédé pour le remplissage des moules d'une presse utilisée dans la fabrication de carreaux en céramique, moyens de mise en oeuvre correspondants et carreaux ainsi fabriqués

Publication

EP 1256428 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02075984 A

Priority

IT RE20010044 A

Abstract (en)

The method for loading ceramic moulds presenting at least one forming cavity (3) to be filled with a layer of powder (51, 52) comprises preparing said layer of powder (51, 52) outside the mould (10), then inserting said layer into said at least one forming cavity (3) without appreciable dislocation and mixing of its constituent powder. The plant for its implementation comprises a loading carriage (66) provided with a powder restraining device, this latter comprising an enclosure (13) having a plan shape and a depth which are practically equal to the plan shape and the height of the layer of powder required to mould the tile (33), and is provided with means (11, 8) arranged to maintain said layer consistent during its transfer from its preparation station to the mould forming cavity. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B28B 13/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B28B 3/02 (2006.01); B28B 11/04 (2006.01); B28B 13/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B28B 13/0205 (2013.01); B28B 3/021 (2013.01); B28B 11/044 (2013.01); B28B 13/022 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1256428 A2 20021113; EP 1256428 A3 20040102; BR 0201417 A 20030225; IT RE20010044 A1 20021028; IT RE20010044 D0 20010427

INPADOC legal status


2009-03-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20081001

2007-04-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070312

2004-09-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-04-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040220

2004-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-01-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI