Global Patent Index - EP 1256446 A2

EP 1256446 A2 2002-11-13 - Adjustable gripper system on a storage drum

Title (en)

Adjustable gripper system on a storage drum

Title (de)

Verstellbare Bogenhaltesysteme an einer Speichertrommel

Title (fr)

Système réglable de pinces sur un tambour collecteur

Publication

EP 1256446 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02005959 A

Priority

DE 10122215 A

Abstract (en)

The sheet-holder systems (9) are situated in the front and back parts and can be adjusted in relation to each other in a peripheral direction. The sheet-holder system for the front part has a storage drum basic body (11), and the sheet-holder system for the back part has a fixable and movable central axle (14) for the storage drum's basic body. The central axle is joined to the sheet-holder system by the side disc of the storage drum's basic body.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Anordnung von Bogenhaltesystemen an Speichertrommeln in Wendeeinrichtungen von Bogendruckmaschinen. Aufgabe der Erfindung ist es, eine Anordnung von Bogenhaltesystemen an Speichertrommeln zu schaffen, die einen steifen Aufbau der Speichertrommel gewährleistet und die eine einfache Verstellung der Bogenhaltesysteme relativ zueinander gewährleistet. Erfindungsgemäß wird die Aufgabe dadurch gelöst, dass Bogenhaltesysteme (8,9) zum Erfassen des Bogens (7) im vorderen und hinteren Bereich vorgesehen und relativ zueinander in Umfangsrichtung verstellbar sind und die Bogenhaltesysteme (8) für den vorderen Bereich einem Speichertrommelgrundkörper (11) und die Bogenhaltesysteme (9) für den hinteren Bereich einer zum Speichertrommelgrundkörper (11) feststell- und verdrehbaren Zentralachse (4) zugeordnet sind und die Verbindung von der Zentralachse (14) auf das Bogenhaltesystem (9) durch die Seitenscheibe (17) des Speichertrommelgrundkörpers (11) erfolgt.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 21/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 21/10 (2006.01); B65H 45/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 21/108 (2013.01); B41F 21/106 (2013.01); B65H 45/165 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1256446 A2 20021113; EP 1256446 A3 20071024; EP 1256446 B1 20090506; DE 10122215 A1 20021114; DE 50213518 D1 20090618; US 2002195770 A1 20021226; US 6705610 B2 20040316

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180305

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160315

2017-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160315

2017-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160331

2016-12-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20161130

2016-11-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160315

2015-08-25 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: KOENIG & BAUER AG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: KOENIG & BAUER AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, 97080 WUERZBURG, DE

- Document: DE 50213518

2015-05-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150319

- Year of fee payment: 14

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150319

- Year of fee payment: 14

2015-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150327

- Year of fee payment: 14

2015-03-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-04-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20100209

2009-06-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50213518 P 20090618

2009-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2009-05-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2008-07-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2008-01-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20071228

2008-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20071119

2007-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2007-10-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI