Global Patent Index - EP 1256448 A2

EP 1256448 A2 2002-11-13 - Sheet guide for a sheet processing machine and method for guiding a sheet

Title (en)

Sheet guide for a sheet processing machine and method for guiding a sheet

Title (de)

Bogenführung für eine Bogen verarbeitende Maschine sowie Verfahren zur Führung eines Bogens

Title (fr)

Conduite des feuilles pour une machine traitant des feuilles et procédé de guidage d'une feuille

Publication

EP 1256448 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02010083 A

Priority

  • DE 10122024 A
  • DE 10220563 A

Abstract (en)

The curved sheet guide for a printing machine has an abutment for aligning the front edge (3) of the sheet (1). The roller has guide sub-rollers to engage the sides of the sheet for guidance along a curved path. The guide sub rollers provide a different curvature to each edge (5,6) of the sheet. The sub rollers are adjustable to regulate the degree of curvature.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Bogenführungsvorrichtung für eine Bogen, insbesondere Blechtafeln, verarbeitende Maschine (15), insbesondere Druckmaschine, mit einer Anschlagseinrichtung zur Ausrichtung der Vorderkante (3) und einer der Seitenkanten (5,6) jedes mittels einer Halte-, insbesondere Greifereinrichtung eingezogenen Bogens (1), und mit der Anschlagseinrichtung in Bogenverarbeitungsrichtung nachgeschalteten Bogenführungsmitteln (20), die den beiden Seitenkanten (5,6) des Bogens (1) bei der Einzugsbewegung (Pfeil 10) jeweils eine gekrümmte Bewegungsbahn verleihen. Es ist vorgesehen, dass die Bogenführungsmittel (20) derart ausgebildet sind, dass sie den den beiden Seitenkanten (5,6) zugeordneten Bewegungsbahnen eine unterschiedlich große Krümmung verleihen. Ferner betrifft die Erfindung ein entsprechendes Verfahren. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 21/14; B65H 5/36; B65H 9/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 5/06 (2006.01); B41F 21/14 (2006.01); B65H 5/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 21/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1256448 A2 20021113; EP 1256448 A3 20040331; EP 1256448 B1 20090729; JP 2002338078 A 20021127

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170531

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160520

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-04-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150507

2016-01-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150507

2014-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140527

- Year of fee payment: 13

2014-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130507

2012-09-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120522

- Year of fee payment: 11

2012-02-29 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50213716

2011-08-05 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50213716

2011-08-05 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50213716

- Representative's name: GLEISS GROSSE SCHRELL & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE, DE

2010-07-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20100503

2009-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2329764 T3

2009-09-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50213716 P 20090910

2009-07-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2009-07-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2009-06-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: KBA-METALPRINT GMBH

2004-12-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2004-12-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-03-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-03-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-03-31 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 41F 21/14 A

2004-03-31 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 65H 5/36 B

2004-03-31 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 65H 9/16 B

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI