Global Patent Index - EP 1256460 A2

EP 1256460 A2 2002-11-13 - Ink jet recording element and printing method

Title (en)

Ink jet recording element and printing method

Title (de)

Tintenstrahl-Aufzeichnungselement und Druckverfahren

Title (fr)

Elément pour l'inpression au jet d'encre et méthode d'impression

Publication

EP 1256460 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02076640 A

Priority

  • US 85002601 A
  • US 85002701 A

Abstract (en)

An ink jet recording element comprising a support having thereon a porous image-receiving layer comprising at least 90% by weight of particles and less than 10% by weight of a binder, the image-receiving layer also containing a nonionic surfactant having an HLB number of less than 10 in an amount to substantially prevent foaming of the coating composition which is used to coat the support with the image-receiving layer.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41M 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/01 (2006.01); B41M 5/00 (2006.01); B41M 5/50 (2006.01); B41M 5/52 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41M 5/52 (2013.01); B41M 5/5218 (2013.01); B41M 5/5227 (2013.01); B41M 5/5254 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1256460 A2 20021113; EP 1256460 A3 20050105; EP 1256460 B1 20061227; DE 60217011 D1 20070208; DE 60217011 T2 20070712; JP 2003019859 A 20030121

INPADOC legal status


2015-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141101

2015-01-22 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60217011

- Effective date: 20141101

2014-11-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60217011

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130430

- Year of fee payment: 12

2012-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100430

2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100425

2011-01-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20101230

2010-12-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100425

2009-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090406

- Year of fee payment: 8

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090312

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-12-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070928

2007-06-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-02-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60217011 P 20070208

2006-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2006-12-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2005-09-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2005-07-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050506

2005-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2005-01-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI