Global Patent Index - EP 1256500 A2

EP 1256500 A2 2002-11-13 - Running gear with wheels

Title (en)

Running gear with wheels

Title (de)

Fahrwerk mit Laufrädern

Title (fr)

Train de roulement avec roues

Publication

EP 1256500 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02090168 A

Priority

DE 10123438 A

Abstract (en)

The bogie has a locking element (15) on the traverse bolt (8) either side of the carrying eye (9), secured axially by a fixing element (16) so that it cannot rotate. Each locking element has a nose-like projection (17) which engages in a recess (18) in the carrying eye to limit the eye's turning angle. The recess forms the stops for the projection.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Fahrwerk (1) mit Laufrädern (6), die auf einem Unterflansch (4) eines Fahrbahnträgers (2) abrollen, wobei der Unterflansch (4) entsprechende Laufflächen für die Laufräder (6) aufweist, mit zwei parallelen Seitenschildern (7), an denen die Laufräder (6) parallel zueinander drehbar gelagert sind und die unterhalb der Laufräder (6) je eine Gewindenabe (11, 12) aufweisen, mit einem Traversenbolzen (8), der beidendig mit einem zu den Innengewinden (11a, 12a) der Gewindenaben (11, 12) korrespondierenden Außengewinde versehen ist und dessen Gewindeenden von den Gewindenaben (11, 12) aufgenommen sind, wobei der Abstand der Seitenschilder (7) und damit der Radabstand der Laufräder (6) durch Verdrehen des Traversenbolzens (8) um seine Längsachse stufenlos einstellbar ist, und mit einer mittig zwischen den Seitenschildern (7) auf dem Traversenbolzen (8) abgestützten Tragöse (9) für eine Last. Um den Radabstand zu fixieren, trägt der Traversenbolzen beidseitig der Tragöse je ein Sicherungselement, das mittels eines Fixierelements axial und drehfest gesichert ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61B 3/00; F16B 21/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61B 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61B 3/00 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 3042225 A1 19811001 - VITAL CHAIN BLOCK MFG [JP]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1256500 A2 20021113; EP 1256500 A3 20031105; DE 10123438 A1 20021121; DE 10123438 C2 20030618

INPADOC legal status


2006-06-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20051201

2004-07-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-03-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040107

2003-11-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-11-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI