Global Patent Index - EP 1256501 A2

EP 1256501 A2 2002-11-13 - Procedure for laying a floor in transport means, in particular in railway vehicles, and floor for transport means

Title (en)

Procedure for laying a floor in transport means, in particular in railway vehicles, and floor for transport means

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Verlegen eines Fussbodens in Transportmitteln, insbesondere in Schienenfahrzeugen, und Fussboden für Transportmittel

Title (fr)

Procédé pour poser un plancher en moyens de transport, en particulier en véhicules ferroviaires, et plancher pour moyens de transport

Publication

EP 1256501 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02009873 A

Priority

DE 10122815 A

Abstract (en)

The floor laying process involved applying a dry adhesive (8) to both sides of the resting elements (7, 7') on their resting surfaces, which correspond to the size of the floorboard, at least in the center and edge parts of the vehicle, and immediately placing them in position and pressing them home so that they stick.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindungen betreffen ein Verfahren zum Verlegen eines Fußbodens in Transportmitteln, insbesondere in Schienenfahrzeugen, und einen Fußboden für Transportmittel, im Wesentlichen Fußbodenplatten (5) aufweisend, die über Auflageelemente (7,7') auf dem Transportmittelrohbau (1) aufgeklebt sind. Dabei wurde beidseitig auf den eben ausgebildeten Auflageflächen der Auflageelemente (7,7') ein Trockenkleber (8) aufgebracht, um danach die Auflageelemente (7,7'), entsprechend der aufzubringenden Fußbodenplattengröße, zumindest in den Gegenden der Längsmitte (3) und der Randpartien (4) des Transportmittels örtlich auf dem Transportmittelrohbau (1) auf- und sofort klebend festzulegen. Daran anschließend ist die Fußbodenplatte (5), auf welcher auf der Oberseite ebenfalls ein Trockenkleber (8) aufgebracht wurde, auf den Auflageelementen (7,7') sofort klebend festzulegen, wonach die Verlegung der nächsten Fußbodenplatte (5), in Transportmittellängsrichtung, in gleicher Weise erfolgt und die sich berührenden Randpartien der Fußbodenplatten (5) gegen ein Auseinanderdriften gesichert werden. Abschließend ist ein aufgerollter Fußboden- oder Gehbelag (9) über den Trockenkleber (8) auszurollen und auf den Fußbodenplatten (15) sofort klebend festzulegen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61D 17/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61D 17/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61D 17/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1256501 A2 20021113; EP 1256501 A3 20031105; EP 1256501 B1 20071219; AT 381475 T 20080115; DE 10122815 A1 20021128; DE 10122815 B4 20060202; DE 50211383 D1 20080131

INPADOC legal status


2014-02-27 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50211383

- Effective date: 20131203

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131203

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120523

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080531

2010-08-31 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071219

2010-07-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080502

2009-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080502

2009-07-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071219

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20081010

2009-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080531

2009-01-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080531

2009-01-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080531

2009-01-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080320

2008-12-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080531

2008-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: BOMBARDIER TRANSPORTATION (BAHNTECHNOLOGIE) HOLDI

- Effective date: 20080531

2008-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: RUDOLF ROST SPERRHOLZ G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20080531

2008-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071219

2008-11-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080922

2008-10-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071219

2008-10-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071219

2008-10-10 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2008-10-01 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2008-09-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080519

2008-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080330

2008-07-16 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

2008-06-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2008-05-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071219

2008-05-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071219

2008-05-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: BOMBARDIER TRANSPORTATION (BAHNTECHNOLOGIE) EN RUD

- Effective date: 20080312

2008-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080319

2008-03-12 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: RUDOLF ROST SPERRHOLZ GMBH

2008-03-12 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: BOMBARDIER TRANSPORTATION (BAHNTECHNOLOGIE) HOLDIN

2008-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50211383 P 20080131

2008-01-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2008-01-09 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2007-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2007-12-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-01-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061213

2004-11-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BOMBARDIER TRANSPORTATION (BAHNTECHNOLOGIE) HOLDIN

2004-11-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: RUDOLF ROST SPERRHOLZ GMBH

2004-09-02 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-08-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040618

2004-08-18 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-07-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-11-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-11-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI