Global Patent Index - EP 1256516 A2

EP 1256516 A2 2002-11-13 - Ocean survival unit

Title (en)

Ocean survival unit

Title (de)

Einheit zum Überleben auf hoher See

Title (fr)

Unité de survie océanique

Publication

EP 1256516 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02253191 A

Priority

GB 0111148 A

Abstract (en)

A life raft or ocean survival unit (1) is capable of self-righting upon capsize, even when occupied by one or more survivors. The life raft (1) comprises a hull-shaped ballast chamber (5) which fills with water upon inflation of the life raft and provides added stability to the vessel and in part see self-righting capabilities to the life raft. Water is sucked in through membrane valves located at the rear of the ballast chamber. The life raft also comprises a canopy (4) and inflatable base section (3), wherein the inflatable base section may be compartmentalised to prevent sinking of the unit in the event of a puncture deflation. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B63C 9/06; B63C 9/04; F16K 15/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B63C 9/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B63C 9/06 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1256516 A2 20021113; EP 1256516 A3 20031112; GB 0111148 D0 20010627; US 2002166494 A1 20021114

INPADOC legal status


2006-03-01 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050817

2005-05-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050404

2004-08-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-07-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040511

2003-11-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-11-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-11-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 63C 9/06 A

2003-11-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 63C 9/04 B

2003-11-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 16K 15/20 B

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI