Global Patent Index - EP 1256518 A2

EP 1256518 A2 2002-11-13 - Stern tube shaft sealing apparatus

Title (en)

Stern tube shaft sealing apparatus

Title (de)

Dichtung für ein Stevenrohr

Title (fr)

Presse-étoupe pour tube d'étambot

Publication

EP 1256518 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02009400 A

Priority

JP 2001141109 A

Abstract (en)

An apparatus for sealing a shaft for a stern tube is disclosed, comprising: a case (32) arranged so as to surround an outer circumference of a propeller shaft (2) of the stern tube; a water seal (34), an oil seal (36), and an intermediate seal (35) provided between the water seal (34) and the oil seal (36) at an inner circumference of the case (32); characterized in that the oil seal (36) and the intermediate seal (35) are made of rubber elastic bodies and provided with bases (361, 351) held by the case (32) and seal lips (362, 352) slidably contacting at a side of the propeller shaft (2), the seal lip (362) of the oil seal (36) facing to an inside of a hull, and the seal lip (352) of the intermediate seal (35) facing to a side of the stern, wherein an air chamber (C) is bounded between the oil seal (36) and the intermediate seal (35), and wherein an air supplier (39) for supplying fluid having a higher pressure than in a drain chamber (B) is connected to the air chamber (C) (Fig. 1). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B63H 23/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B63H 23/36 (2006.01); B63B 59/00 (2006.01); B63H 23/32 (2006.01); F16J 15/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B63H 23/321 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1256518 A2 20021113; EP 1256518 A3 20030903; JP 2002340199 A 20021127; KR 20020086236 A 20021118

INPADOC legal status


2004-12-01 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040304

2004-07-01 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-05-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-09-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-09-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI