Global Patent Index - EP 1256522 A2

EP 1256522 A2 2002-11-13 - Jar with closure lid and security seal

Title (en)

Jar with closure lid and security seal

Title (de)

Gefäss und Deckel mit eine Garantiebande

Title (fr)

Pot et couvercle ayant une bague d' inviolabilité

Publication

EP 1256522 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02008925 A

Priority

IT MI20010980 A

Abstract (en)

A jar (V) with closure lid (C) and security seal, in which the seal consists of a profiled piece having an annular portion (7) which is firmly fixed to the lid and another annular portion (8) which becomes fixed to the jar when the lid with the seal attached is closed for the first time, the seal being broken when the lid is opened for the first time, to leave said two annular portions secured to the lid and to the jar respectively. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 41/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 1/10 (2006.01); B65D 43/02 (2006.01); B65D 55/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 43/0231 (2013.01); B65D 1/10 (2013.01); B65D 55/0872 (2013.01); B65D 2101/0007 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00092 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00296 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00351 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00527 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00537 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00981 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1256522 A2 20021113; EP 1256522 A3 20030625; IT MI20010980 A1 20021111; IT MI20010980 D0 20010511; US 2002166836 A1 20021114

INPADOC legal status


2004-09-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031230

2004-04-22 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-03-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI