Global Patent Index - EP 1256524 A1

EP 1256524 A1 2002-11-13 - Method of filling a container comprising a sprinkling device as well as a container for such a method

Title (en)

Method of filling a container comprising a sprinkling device as well as a container for such a method

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Abfüllen eines Verpackungsbehälters mit Streuvorrichtung sowie Verpackungsbehälter für ein solches Verfahren

Title (fr)

Procédé de replissage d'un récipient pourvu d'une saupoudreuse ainsi qu'un récipient pour un tel procédé

Publication

EP 1256524 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01810447 A

Priority

EP 01810447 A

Abstract (en)

The packing container filling process is for friable contents for scattering, e.g. on food. The scattering part (20) is initially fitted on the underside of the re-closing cap (27) and is releasably connected to it. These two joined components are then fitted together in a single operation to the container part (11), so that the scattering part is locked in the interior of the container part.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Verfahren zum Abfüllen eines Verpackungsbehälters mit Streuvorrichtung (10), welcher Verpackungsbehälter (10) ein mit einer verschliessbaren Oeffnung (34) ausgestattetes Behälterteil (11), ein mit einer oder mehreren Streuöffnungen versehenes Streuteil (20) und einen aufsetzbaren Wiederverschlussdeckel (27) aufweist, wobei das Streuteil (20) die Oeffnung (34) des Behälterteils (11) abdeckt und der Wiederverschlussdeckel (27) die mit dem Streuteil (20) abgedeckte Oeffnung (34) verschliesst, wird der offene Verpackungsbehälter (10) zunächst mit einem Inhalt gefüllt und anschliessend die Oeffnung (34) des gefüllten Verpackungsbehälters (10) durch das Streuteil (20) abgedeckt und durch Aufsetzen des Wiederverschlussdeckels (27) verschlossen. Eine Vereinfachung des Verfahrens wird dadurch erreicht, dass zunächst das Streuteil (20) auf der Unterseite des Wiederverschlussdeckel (27) angeordnet und mit diesem lösbar verbunden wird, und dass dann der Wiederverschlussdeckel (27) und das damit verbundene Streuteil (20) zusammen in einem Arbeitsgang auf das Behälterteil (11) aufgesetzt werden, derart, dass das Streuteil (20) im Inneren des Behälterteils (11) einrastend gehalten wird. <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 47/18; B65D 51/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 47/18 (2006.01); B65D 51/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 51/18 (2013.01); B65D 47/185 (2013.01); B65D 2251/0018 (2013.01); B65D 2251/0087 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1256524 A1 20021113

INPADOC legal status


2006-02-01 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050727

2005-05-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050316

2003-08-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030430

2003-08-13 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Payment date: 20030430

- Countries: AL

2003-08-13 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Payment date: 20030430

- Countries: LT

2003-08-13 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Payment date: 20030430

- Countries: LV

2003-08-13 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Payment date: 20030430

- Countries: MK

2003-08-13 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Payment date: 20030430

- Countries: RO

2003-08-13 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Payment date: 20030430

- Countries: SI

2003-07-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI