Global Patent Index - EP 1256525 A2

EP 1256525 A2 2002-11-13 - Closure for a two component cartridge

Title (en)

Closure for a two component cartridge

Title (de)

Verschluss für eine Zweikomponenten-Kartusche

Title (fr)

Fermeture pour une cartouche à deux composants

Publication

EP 1256525 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02003861 A

Priority

DE 20106406 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: US2002153377A1] A breech for a dual-component cartridge with a breech plug with two sealing bolts which can be inserted into the two mutually separated outlet openings at the cartridge throat and seal these openings tightly, and with a retaining nut that can be screwed onto the cartridge throat. This nut can turn relative to the breech plug and can be locked to it in an axial direction and released therefrom. In order that the breech plug will be held by the retaining nut without additional parts and so that it can again be easily separated from it, between the retaining nut and the breech plug a manual-detachable snap-in connection is formed by the relative movement of the breech plug in the axial direction.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Verschluß für eine Zweikomponenten-Kartusche mit einem Verschlußstopfen (7) mit zwei Dichtungsbolzen (8), die in die beiden voneinander getrennten Austrittsöffnungen (5) am Kartuschenhals (4) einsetzbar sind und diese abdichtend verschließen, und mit einer auf den Kartuschenhals (4) aufschraubbaren Überwurfmutter (1) welche relativ zum Verschlußstopfen (7) drehbar und mit diesem in Axialrichtung lösbar verriegelt ist. Damit der Verschlußstopfen von der Überwurfmutter ohne zusätzliche Teile gehalten wird und von dieser wieder leicht getrennt werden kann, ist zwischen der Überwurfmutter und dem Verschlußstopfen (7) eine durch deren Relativbewegung in Axialrichtung einrastende und von Hand lösbare Schnappverbindung (10, 11) gebildet . <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 81/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 81/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 81/3283 (2013.01); B65D 81/325 (2013.01); B05C 17/00506 (2013.01); B05C 17/00513 (2013.01); B05C 17/0052 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 20106406 U1 20020822; AT 294118 T 20050515; CN 1214954 C 20050817; CN 1380226 A 20021120; EP 1256525 A2 20021113; EP 1256525 A3 20030625; EP 1256525 B1 20050427; ES 2240587 T3 20051016; US 2002153377 A1 20021024; US 6769564 B2 20040803

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180223

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20180227

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-05-31 [PGFP TR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Payment date: 20180220

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180219

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20180216

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20180327

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180216

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-02-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-02-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-02-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-02-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: DR. GRAF AND PARTNER AG INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY, CH

2014-02-28 [REG CH PCOW] CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF PATENT OWNER(S)

- Free text: NEW ADDRESS: SULZERALLEE 48, 8404 WINTERTHUR (CH)

2008-11-28 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050427

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: SULZER CHEMTECH A.G.

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-04-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060130

2006-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-02-28 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-02-28 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-02-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-02-21 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060221

2005-11-30 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-11-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2005-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2240587 T3

2005-10-10 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051010

2005-07-27 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050727

2005-07-27 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050727

2005-07-27 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050727

2005-06-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50202882 P 20050602

2005-05-18 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2005-05-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050427

2005-04-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-04-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: LUCHS & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE

2005-04-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2005-04-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-04-27 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050427

2005-04-27 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050427

2005-04-27 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050427

2004-09-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SULZER CHEMTECH AG

2004-03-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-01-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031210

2003-07-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030524

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI