Global Patent Index - EP 1256531 A1

EP 1256531 A1 2002-11-13 - Separator for sheet front edge

Title (en)

Separator for sheet front edge

Title (de)

Bogenvorderkantentrenner

Title (fr)

Dispositif séparateur du bord frontal des feuilles

Publication

EP 1256531 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02009000 A

Priority

DE 10122632 A

Abstract (en)

The double suction pieces (1) move to and fro on an enclosed track, driven by cam-coupled gears in the sheets' direction of movement (3). Two horizontal gear-elements (6,7) have ends linked, with a vertical space between them, to a suction coupling (8) supporting a double suction piece; the other ends are horizontally moved by a cam gear. The ends of a first and second gear-element have a vertical first (9) and second (10) rocker arm linked to each of them. The end of the first and second rocker arms swivels on a first (11) and second (13) fixed swivel axle and is driven by a rotary cam-disc (12,14) of a first and second cam gear.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung bezieht sich auf einen Bogenvorderkantentrenner mit mehreren nebeneinander angeordneten Doppelsaugern 1 zur taktweisen Förderung von Bogen 2, wobei die Doppelsauger 1 durch Kurbelkoppelgetriebe angetrieben Bewegungen auf einer geschlossenen Bahn in Förderrichtung 3 der Bogen 2 und zurück ausführen, und dabei die Doppelsauger 1 in einem zwei Arbeitstakte aufweisenden Bewegungszyklus um einen Arbeitstakt versetzt nacheinander in den Bereich der Stapelvorderkante 4 eines Bogenstapels 5 zur Erfassung eines Bogens 2 gelangen wobei die Bewegung jedes Doppelsaugers 1 mittels zweier voneinander beabstandeter Drehgelenke eingeleitet wird. Der Mechanismus zum Antreiben des Doppelsaugers 1 weist einen Getriebefreiheitsgrad von Drei auf, derart, daß neben der geschlossenen Bewegungsbahn des Doppelsaugers 1 auch dessen Kippwinkel exakt steuerbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 3/00; B65H 3/08; B65H 3/36; B65H 3/40; B65H 3/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 3/08 (2006.01); B65H 3/36 (2006.01); B65H 3/40 (2006.01); B65H 3/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 3/42 (2013.01); B65H 3/0833 (2013.01); B65H 3/36 (2013.01); B65H 3/40 (2013.01); B65H 2403/512 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1256531 A1 20021113; EP 1256531 B1 20040915; AT 276187 T 20041015; DE 10122632 A1 20021121

INPADOC legal status


2014-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121101

2014-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130430

2013-12-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 276187 T

- Effective date: 20130430

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20120419

- Year of fee payment: 11

2013-02-21 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50200984

- Effective date: 20121101

2012-06-28 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: MANROLAND SHEETFED GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: MANROLAND AG, 63075 OFFENBACH, DE

- Document: DE 50200984

- Effective date: 20120509

2011-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110421

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080423

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080430

2009-01-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20081231

2008-12-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080423

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070416

- Year of fee payment: 6

2007-11-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070426

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-09-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050616

2005-04-20 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-03-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-10-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50200984 P 20041021

2004-10-20 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-10-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040915

2004-09-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB

2004-09-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-09-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030805

2003-07-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB

2002-11-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020816

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI