Global Patent Index - EP 1256536 A2

EP 1256536 A2 2002-11-13 - Conveying device for flat articles, preferably paper sheets

Title (en)

Conveying device for flat articles, preferably paper sheets

Title (de)

Transporteinrichtung für flaches Transportgut vorzugsweise Papier

Title (fr)

Dispositif de transport pour des articles plats, de préférence des feuilles de papier

Publication

EP 1256536 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02009878 A

Priority

DE 10122716 A

Abstract (en)

The conveyor belt (2) is contained in at least one guide (4) so as to leave at least one suction-gap between at least one lengthwise edge (14,15) of the conveyor belt and the adjacent side (26,27) of the guide. The conveyor belt has a profiled part (18) consisting of protuberances and recesses (19) over which the vacuum affects the goods being conveyed (7).

Abstract (de)

Die Transporteinrichtung (1) hat ein Transportband (2) und eine Saugvorrichtung (6). Um die Transporteinrichtung so auszubilden, daß das Transportband (2) einfach und kostengünstig hergestellt werden kann und dennoch eine hohe Einsatzdauer und einen einwandfreien Luftdurchlaß gewährleistet, ist das Transportband (2) im Transportbereich in einer Führung (4) so untergebracht, daß zwischen einem Längsrand (14, 15) des Transportbandes (2) und der benachbarten Seitenwand (26, 27) der Führung (4) ein Saugspalt (X) gebildet ist. Dadurch kann der von der Saugvorrichtung (6) erzeugte Unterdruck über den Saugspalt auf das Transportgut (7) wirken. Die Transporteinrichtung (1) kann für Falzmaschinen, Kuvertiermaschinen und dergleichen eingesetzt werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 5/22; B65H 5/02; B65H 29/16; B65H 29/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 5/22 (2006.01); B65H 11/00 (2006.01); B65H 29/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 11/002 (2013.01); B65H 5/224 (2013.01); B65H 29/242 (2013.01); B65H 2301/44322 (2013.01); B65H 2404/22 (2013.01); B65H 2404/243 (2013.01); B65H 2406/3124 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1256536 A2 20021113; EP 1256536 A3 20040204; EP 1256536 B1 20060712; DE 10122716 A1 20021114; DE 50207465 D1 20060824; ES 2263703 T3 20061216; US 2002171196 A1 20021121; US 6746015 B2 20040608

INPADOC legal status


2014-08-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130503

2014-06-12 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20140612

2014-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130531

2014-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130502

2014-03-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140131

2014-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130502

2014-02-27 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50207465

- Effective date: 20131203

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131203

2014-01-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130502

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120508

- Year of fee payment: 11

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120725

- Year of fee payment: 11

2012-09-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120504

- Year of fee payment: 11

2012-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120509

- Year of fee payment: 11

2012-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120608

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-07-29 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20110616

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100502

2007-06-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070413

2007-02-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2263703 T3

2006-11-15 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20061025

2006-08-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50207465 P 20060824

2006-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2006-07-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-07-12 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060712

2004-10-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-09-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040708

2004-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-02-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-02-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 65H 5/22 A

2004-02-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 65H 29/24 B

2004-02-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 65H 29/16 B

2004-02-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 65H 5/02 B

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI