Global Patent Index - EP 1256541 A2

EP 1256541 A2 2002-11-13 - Roll product and winding method

Title (en)

Roll product and winding method

Title (de)

Aufgewickelte Materialbahn und Verfahren zum Aufwickeln

Title (fr)

Produit enroulé et procédé d'enroulage

Publication

EP 1256541 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02010055 A

Priority

  • JP 2001137451 A
  • JP 2001141663 A
  • JP 2001189860 A
  • JP 2001394945 A
  • JP 2001394951 A
  • JP 2002102689 A

Abstract (en)

An improved roll product (1) is proposed in which a long strip of film or sheet (4) is wound on a core (2a) without using a conventional paper tube. The core used can be discarded without difficulty. The core (2a) is formed by bending a flat board of cardboard into a cylindrical shape. The side edges (3) of the flat board may be spaced apart, butted together or overlapped. The side edges may or may not be joined together. The end of the film (4a) gets caught between the side edges (3) of the flat board. This arrangement allows the film wound to be used up to the last inch while applying a tension thereto and without breakage of the core or winding displacement. A cap may be fitted into both ends of the core to increase the shape retainability of the core. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 75/22; B65H 18/28; B65H 75/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 75/02 (2006.01); B65H 75/22 (2006.01); B65H 75/28 (2006.01); B65H 18/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 18/28 (2013.01); B65H 75/22 (2013.01); B65H 75/28 (2013.01); B65H 2301/414325 (2013.01); B65H 2402/412 (2013.01); B65H 2515/12 (2013.01); B65H 2701/1752 (2013.01); B65H 2701/5112 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1256541 A2 20021113; EP 1256541 A3 20030716; AU 3703502 A 20021114; CN 1384036 A 20021211; KR 20020085834 A 20021116; US 2002190152 A1 20021219

INPADOC legal status


2005-04-20 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050224

2004-04-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-03-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040109

2003-07-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-07-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI