Global Patent Index - EP 1256641 A2

EP 1256641 A2 2002-11-13 - Highly oriented polyolefin fibre

Title (en)

Highly oriented polyolefin fibre

Title (de)

Hochorientierte Polyolefinfaser

Title (fr)

Fibres de polyoléfine fortement orientées

Publication

EP 1256641 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02078408 A

Priority

  • EP 99907960 A
  • NL 1010413 A

Abstract (en)

The invention relates to a highly oriented polyolefin fibre containing polyolefin with an intrinsic viscosity of at least 5 dl/g, which fibre has a tensile strength of at least 26 cN/dtex and a modulus of tension of at least 700 cN/dtex, a process for the preparation thereof and the use in ropes or anti-ballistic shaped articles. The invention also relates to improved ropes and anti-ballistic shaped articles. The highly oriented polyolefin fibre according to the invention has improved properties in applications such as, in particular, anti-ballistic shaped articles since the fibre contains 0.05 - 5 wt.% of a solvent for the polyolefin (relative to the total fibre weight).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01F 6/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01F 6/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01F 6/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 0024952 A1 20000504; AU 2748999 A 20000515; CA 2348518 A1 20000504; CA 2348518 C 20070703; CN 1122124 C 20030924; CN 1332812 A 20020123; DE 69904361 D1 20030116; DE 69904361 T2 20031030; DE 69904361 T3 20070118; EP 1137828 A1 20011004; EP 1137828 B1 20021204; EP 1137828 B2 20051123; EP 1256641 A2 20021113; EP 1256641 A3 20030326; ES 2189394 T3 20030701; ES 2189394 T5 20060501; HK 1042121 A1 20040625; IL 142789 A 20060410; IL 172893 A 20080320; NL 1010413 C1 20000501; TW 444074 B 20010701

INPADOC legal status


2005-07-27 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20050213

2003-12-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

2003-09-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030730

2003-09-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: DSM IP ASSETS B.V.

2003-05-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030325

2003-03-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

2003-03-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

2003-03-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-11-13 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1137828

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI