Global Patent Index - EP 1256645 A1

EP 1256645 A1 2002-11-13 - Flat knitting machine having at least a needle bed

Title (en)

Flat knitting machine having at least a needle bed

Title (de)

Flachstrickmaschine mit mindestens einem Führungsbett

Title (fr)

Métier à tricoter rectiligne comprenant au moins une fonture

Publication

EP 1256645 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01111016 A

Priority

EP 01111016 A

Abstract (en)

A flat knitting assembly has a guide bed (300) for knitting needles or mesh transfer elements. The needles rest in grooves (110) within the guide bed. One or more of the guide beds (300) is transversely subdivided into two (100, 200) at an interface point (150) that does not interrupt the pattern of grooves (110). When the two parts (100, 200) are end-to-end all the longitudinal grooves are at the same lateral intervals. All guide bed (300) parts (100, 200) can move longitudinally together or individually. The separation interfaces (150) are positioned between the guide bed (300) parts (100, 200). The guide bed parts have a toothed interface line.

Abstract (de)

Eine Flachstrickmaschine mit mindestens einem Führungsbett für Strickwerkzeuge wie Nadeln oder Maschentransferelemente, wobei die Strickwerkzeuge in Nuten (110, 210) des mindestens einen Führungsbetts (300) verschiebbar gelagert sind und wobei das mindestens eine Führungsbett (300) quer zu seiner Längsrichtung in mindestens zwei Teile (100, 200) geteilt ist, wobei die Trennstellen (150) zwischen den Teilen (100, 200) derart angeordnet sind, dass das Raster der Nuten (110, 210) des mindestens einen Führungsbetts (300) durch sie nicht unterbrochen wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D04B 15/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D04B 15/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04B 15/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1256645 A1 20021113; EP 1256645 B1 20070725; CN 1384234 A 20021211; DE 50112761 D1 20070906; ES 2287053 T3 20071216

INPADOC legal status


2012-02-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110508

2010-10-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090509

2010-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100505

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-07-29 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090509

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091201

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080618

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080418

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-07-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080428

2007-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2287053 T3

2007-09-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50112761 P 20070906

2007-07-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT

2004-01-07 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT

2003-09-04 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-07-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-11-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020502

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI