Global Patent Index - EP 1256647 A2

EP 1256647 A2 2002-11-13 - Method for operating a sewing machine with upper and lower transport bands

Title (en)

Method for operating a sewing machine with upper and lower transport bands

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Betrieb einer Nähmaschine mit einem oberen und unteren Transportband

Title (fr)

Procédé pour faire fonctionner une machine à coudre avec une bande de transport supérieure et inférieure

Publication

EP 1256647 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02010304 A

Priority

DE 10122509 A

Abstract (en)

In a process to operate a sewing machine with upper (11, 15) and lower (21, 34, 35) fabric transport belts, each belt has an intermittently operated drive unit. The advance drive operates when the needle is clear of the fabric and interrupts when the needle is inserted. The fabric advances without jumping and only longitudinally in a gap between the upper and lower belts. The fabric upper face is subjected to advancement by several drive belts (11, 15). The fabric lower face is subjected to advancement by several drive belts (21, 34, 35). The upper and lower belts are operated by a step motor, analogue motor or mechanical step gear. The needle operation is synchronised with the drive system.

Abstract (de)

Die vorliegenden Erfindung beschreibt ein Verfahren zum Betrieb einer Nähmaschine mit oberen und unteren Transportbändern für den Nähguttransport. Sie zeichnet sich dadurch aus, dass sowohl dem oberen Transportband als auch dem unteren Transportband ein intermittierender Vorschubantrieb zugeordnet ist <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D05B 27/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D05B 27/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D05B 27/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1256647 A2 20021113; EP 1256647 A3 20041201; DE 10122509 A1 20021114

INPADOC legal status


2006-03-01 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050602

2005-09-29 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2005-08-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2004-12-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-12-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI