Global Patent Index - EP 1256648 A2

EP 1256648 A2 2002-11-13 - Device for inserting a needle thread through the eye of a sewing machine needle

Title (en)

Device for inserting a needle thread through the eye of a sewing machine needle

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Einführen des Oberfadens in das Ohr der Nadel an einer Nähmaschine

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour faire passer le fil d'aiguille à travers le chas d'une aiguille de machine à coudre

Publication

EP 1256648 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02405137 A

Priority

CH 7872001 A

Abstract (en)

A threader comprises two guide clips that include two first sections parallel to one another and two second sections converging at an angle and adjacent to the first sections. The second sections transition into curved fourth sections whose peaks have a smaller distance from one another than the first sections. The curved fourth sections are followed by diverging fifth sections. <??>A threader (19) comprises a hook to grasp an upper thread (63); two guide clips, one located on each side of the hook; and a swivel arm that holds the hook and the guide clips and that is fastened to a lower end of a rotating guide stem and through which the hook and the guide clips are held and can be moved into and out of an area of a needle (7). The guide clips comprise two first sections that are parallel to one another and two second sections that converge at an angle and are adjacent to the first sections. The second sections transition into curved fourth sections having peaks that have a smaller distance from one another than the two adjacent first sections. The curved fourth sections are followed by diverging fifth sections.

Abstract (de)

Die Vorrichtung zum Einführen des Oberfadens in das Öhr der Nadel (7) einer Nähmaschine umfasst zwei Leitbacken (49,51), welche zwei Einführabschnitte (53,55) umfassen, welche in einer Schmalstelle enden. Die beiden Leitbacken (49,51) sind gleichartig ausgeführt und können sich beim Auffahren auf die Nadel gleichmässig spreizen und der in einer Mittelebene zu den beiden Leitbacken (49,51) liegende Fanghaken (57) wird stets exakt zentriert in das Nadelöhr (25) der Nadel (7) geleitet. Zusätzlich sind die beiden Leitbacken (49,51) um eine horizontale Achse (B) pendelnd aufgehängt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D05B 87/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D05B 87/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D05B 87/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1256648 A2 20021113; EP 1256648 A3 20030502; EP 1256648 B1 20070307; DE 50209624 D1 20070419; US 2002157586 A1 20021031; US 6701858 B2 20040309

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20180223

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180227

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170428

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-02-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: GACHNANG AG PATENTANWAELTE, CH

2013-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110227

2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110226

2011-10-04 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2010-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20100225

- Year of fee payment: 9

2010-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100127

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-08-31 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: BERNINA INTERNATIONAL AG

- Free text: FRITZ GEGAUF AG#SEESTRASSE 161#8266 STECKBORN (CH) -TRANSFER TO- BERNINA INTERNATIONAL AG#SEESTRASSE 161#8266 STECKBORN (CH)

2008-02-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20071210

2007-06-26 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2007-05-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20070425

2007-04-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50209624 P 20070419

2007-03-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2007-03-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: HANS RUDOLF GACHNANG PATENTANWALT

2007-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB IT LI SE

2007-03-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-12-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: FRITZ GEGAUF AG

2004-01-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB IT LI SE

2003-08-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030616

2003-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI